Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-02811
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2021
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday May 18, 2022 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOHN WILLIAMS
Represented By
TIMOTHY RAY WEST
Bertram & Graf Llc - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/13 9:27 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/19 10:56 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WEST, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/19 10:54 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6553400.), filed by JOHN WILLIAMS. (WEST, TIMOTHY)
Related: [-]