Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-02862
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2021
Terminated:Jun 02, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday May 18, 2022 5:20 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
SUSAN ASH
Represented By
TAYLOR CHRISTOPHER BARTLETT
Heninger Garrison Davis Llc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, June 02, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Thu 06/02 1:30 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's 4 MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss Without Prejudice is GRANTED. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/2/2022. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
4 4 motion Dismiss Wed 06/01 12:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by SUSAN ASH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/15/2022) . (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 06/01 12:57 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice (duplicate case) (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 11/19 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum- Northern District of Mississippi by SUSAN ASH (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/19 1:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/19 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6553805.), filed by SUSAN ASH. (BARTLETT, TAYLOR)
Related: [-]