Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-02887
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2021
Terminated:Jan 12, 2023
Case in other court:None, None
Last checked: Wednesday May 18, 2022 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
DAVID HARMON
Represented By
BASIL E ADHAM
Johnson Law Group - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, January 12, 2023
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 01/17 10:49 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/12/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/19 2:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ADHAM, BASIL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/19 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6554001.), filed by DAVID HARMON. (ADHAM, BASIL)
Related: [-]