Brusalis v. OS Restaurant Services LLC et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Susan R Bolton |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-01980 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 18, 2022 2:31 AM MST |
Defendant
OS Restaurant Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Brusalis
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Bloomin' Brands Incorporated
Terminated: 05/04/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
minute_ord
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 12/06 2:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice (Doc.28 ), this civil case is terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NKS) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 12/05 12:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Alexander Brusalis. (Hogg, William) |
|
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 06/24 11:23 AM
ORDER denying the Joint26 Motion to Stay for 90 Days. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R. Bolton on 6/24/2022. (ESG) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Stay
Tue 06/21 2:26 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Alexander Brusalis.(Hogg, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 15, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 06/15 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by OS Restaurant Services LLC. (Nagy, Tibor) |
|
Thursday, May 26, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 05/26 10:22 AM
Defendant's ANSWER to23 Amended Complaint by OS Restaurant Services LLC.(Nagy, Tibor) |
|
Wednesday, May 04, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 05/04 1:45 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Alexander Brusalis.(Hogg, William) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/04 1:41 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Withdrawing Consents to Join Collective Action by Alexander Brusalis . (Hogg, William) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 05/03 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Bloomin' Brands Incorporated, OS Restaurant Services LLC. (Nagy, Tibor) |
|
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 04/21 2:41 PM
ORDER granting19 Stipulation. The Parties have stipulated that Plaintiff will dismiss without prejudice the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA") claims in this matter and proceed solely on the Arizona state law claims. The Parties further stipulate pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 that Plaintiff will file such an amended complaint to that effect. The Court grants that Stipulation and Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint to comport with the parties' stipulation by no later than fourteen (14) days after the filing of their Stipulation. Fact Discovery due by 12/16/2022 . Any motion for class certification or dispositive motions due by 5/5/2023 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/21/22. (MAW) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Wed 04/20 2:18 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Scheduling Order by Alexander Brusalis.(Hogg, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Thu 04/07 2:55 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton: Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/2022. The Court notes that the parties' Joint Case Management Report (Doc.17 ) does not provide proposed deadlines but instead requests the Court not enter any deadlines until a ruling issues on a motion for conditional certification of the wage claim. Counsel also failed to provide a proposed deadline for the filing of said motion. Discussion held. IT IS ORDERED directing Plaintiff to file the motion for conditional certification and Defendants to file any Rule 12 motion no later than April 22, 2022. If no motions are filed, counsel are directed to submit a proposed case management plan on April 22, 2022, that sets a schedule for discovery up to and including the filing of a motion for class certification. Counsel are to also indicate in said report whether the parties are proposing general discovery or discovery limited as to class certification. APPEARANCES: William Hogg and Matthew Grimsley (both appearing telephonically) for Plaintiff. Tibor Nagy, Jr., and Chris Pace (both appearing telephonically) for Defendants. (Court Reporter Elva Cruz-Lauer) Hearing held 10:46 AM to 10:59 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Report - Other
Thu 03/31 12:01 PM
*REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Alexander Brusalis. (Hogg, William) *Modified to correct event and text on 3/31/2022 (REK) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/15 1:27 PM
NOTICE re: Filing Consents to Join Collective Action Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b) by Alexander Brusalis .(Hogg, William) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Forms | ||
Friday, February 25, 2022 | ||
misc
Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion
Fri 02/25 2:28 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Chris R Pace on behalf of Defendants Bloomin' Brands Incorporated, OS Restaurant Services LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Wednesday, February 23, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 02/23 3:42 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for April 7, 2022 at 10:45 a.m. in Courtroom 502, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/23/22. (MAW) |
|
Tuesday, February 22, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 02/22 7:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bloomin' Brands Incorporated, OS Restaurant Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bloomin' Brands for OS Restaurant Services LLC. (Nagy, Tibor) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/22 7:02 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint by Bloomin' Brands Incorporated, OS Restaurant Services LLC.(Nagy, Tibor) |
|
Tuesday, February 15, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 02/15 11:00 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have until, and including, February 22, 2022 to file an answer to the Complaint or otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/15/22. (MAW) |
|
Monday, February 14, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 02/14 4:03 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint by Bloomin' Brands Incorporated.(Nagy, Tibor) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/21 8:26 AM
NOTICE re: Waiver of the Service of Summons by Alexander Brusalis . (Hogg, William) |
|
Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 01/18 3:44 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed. R. Civ. P., that this action shall be dismissed without further notice after February 17, 2022, unless before then Plaintiff has served Defendants with the summons and complaint and has filed with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l) or has shown good cause for the failure to timely serve. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/18/22. (MAW) |
|
Thursday, January 06, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 01/06 1:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 21-1980 PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
7 | 7
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Thu 01/06 1:34 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Tuesday, December 21, 2021 | ||
misc
Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 12/21 1:01 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alanna Klein Fischer on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander Brusalis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Tuesday, December 14, 2021 | ||
misc
Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 12/14 1:25 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for William Hogg on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander Brusalis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Friday, December 10, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 12/10 6:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Bloomin' Brands Incorporated, OS Restaurant Services LLC.(BAS) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Thursday, December 09, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 12/09 7:57 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Alexander Brusalis. (Grimsley, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Thu 12/09 7:56 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Alexander Brusalis. (Grimsley, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, December 01, 2021 | ||
misc
Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion
Wed 12/01 3:40 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew S Grimsley on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander Brusalis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 11/19 4:51 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20087270. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 21-1980 PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/19 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20087270 filed by Alexander Brusalis. (Grimsley, Matthew)(MYE) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit |