Trevino v. Iden
Original Case: 5:17-cv-01133
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-51105 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 22, 2023 3:27 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Derek Iden, Agent
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
John Brauchle, Agent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Ernest C. Trevino
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 21 2023
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-51105 Reversed and Rendered ] Judge: JLW , Judge: SAH , Judge: CTW. Mandate issue date is 09/12/2023 [21-51105] |
Docket last updated: 08/22/2023 3:27 AM CDT |
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. John Brauchle and Mr. Derek Iden 21-51105 (MBC) |