KREINER v. 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-02969 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2021 |
Case in other court: | None, None |
Last checked: Wednesday May 18, 2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
GUY KREINER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Mon 11/22 9:04 AM
Case transferred in from Gainesville Division Division on 11/22/2021 Case Number 1:21-cv-190. (djb) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/22 8:57 AM
ORDER - The Clerk is hereby directed to assign all actions filed in, removed to, or transferred to this district which relate to, or seek damages from use of, the 3M Combat Arms Earplugs to the undersigned in the Pensacola Division. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/23/2019. (djb) |
|
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (ADHAM, BASIL) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6553450.), filed by GUY KREINER. (ADHAM, BASIL) |