ESTIVERNE v. ALEXANDER et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Jose R Almonte |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-20140 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday May 21, 2022 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
FREDA ALEXANDER
|
|
Defendant
SAMUEL DELANEY BROWN
13216 Fox Bow Dr, Apt 206
Upper Marlboro,, MD 20774 |
|
Notice Only
arbnwk
|
|
Plaintiff
MICHEL ESTIVERNE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without costs and without Prejudice as to Defendant, SAMUEL D. BROWN. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 6/9/2023. (jd, ) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
![]() STIPULATION by MICHEL ESTIVERNE. (COSTELLO, EDWARD) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order
Tue 06/06 10:50 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter (ECF No. 37) informing the Court that the matter will be promptly voluntarily dismissed as to Samuel Delaney Brown, the only remaining Defendant. Accordingly, the status conference scheduled for June 6, 2023, at 2:30 p.m. is adjourned. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 6/6/2023. (smf) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
![]() Letter from Edward M. Costello III, Esquire. (COSTELLO, EDWARD) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant FREDA ALEXANDER. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/29/2023. (mxw) |
|
35 | 35
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by FREDA ALEXANDER. (SMITH, FELICIA) (Main Document 35 replaced on 3/29/2023) (mxw, ) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order
Fri 02/10 6:05 PM
TEXT ORDER: A status conference is scheduled for June 6, 2023, at 2:30 p.m. Please dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 1364268. No later than May 30, 2023, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 2/10/2023. (smf) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 02/10 6:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte: Status Conference held on 2/9/2023. The parties are preparing to conduct depositions and secure an independent medical examination. A status conference is scheduled for June 6, 2023, at 2:30 p.m. (smf) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Letter from Both parties. (COSTELLO, EDWARD) |
|
Monday, October 17, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
![]() PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 10/17/2022. (mxw) |
|
31 | 31
order
Order
Mon 10/17 1:38 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will enter a pretrial scheduling order with discovery deadlines. A status conference is scheduled for February 9, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. Please dial (888) 684-8852 and enter access code 1364268. No later than February 2, 2023, the parties shall file a joint letter not to exceed five (5) pages summarizing the status of the case. To the extent the parties wish to raise a discovery dispute through the status letter, they shall do so consistent with the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 10/17/2022. (smf) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Mon 10/17 1:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/17/2022. A pretrial scheduling order shall follow setting forth discovery deadlines. A status conference is scheduled for February 9, 2023. (smf) |
||
Monday, October 10, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Joint Discovery Plan by MICHEL ESTIVERNE.(COSTELLO, EDWARD) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
![]() LETTER ORDER Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1. On 10/17/2022 at 11:00 PM there shall be an Initial Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 8/8/2022. (smf) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ANGELA E. CAMERON for FREDA ALEXANDER added.. (SMITH, FELICIA) |
|
27 | 27
![]() ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FREDA ALEXANDER.(SMITH, FELICIA) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
order
Order
Sun 07/31 7:35 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's request that the Court enter an order deeming Defendant Freda Alexander served is granted. Defendant Alexander is deemed served and shall file her response to the Complaint within the time set forth by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 7/29/2022. (smf) |
||
Wednesday, July 27, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
![]() LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's24 Letter requesting that the case remain active on the docket and that Defendant Samuel Delaney Brown be deemed served. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 7/27/2022. (mxw) |
|
Friday, July 22, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() RESPONSE. (COSTELLO, EDWARD) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Certification on behalf of MICHEL ESTIVERNE. (COSTELLO, EDWARD) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Summons Returned Unexecuted by MICHEL ESTIVERNE as to FREDA ALEXANDER. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
Thursday, July 14, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for COMPLAINT served on FREDA ALEXANDER A/K/A FRIEDA ALEXANDER on 07/13/2022, filed by MICHEL ESTIVERNE. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 41.1(a) as to defendant, Samuel Delaney Brown. Motion set for 7/27/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (lr, ) |
|
order
Order
Wed 07/13 11:26 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the affidavit at ECF No. 18 and finds that the service attempt does not comply with this Court's Order granting the motion for alternative service with modification to the relief sought (ECF No. 17). No later than July 20, 2022, Plaintiff's counsel shall file a certification along with any necessary affidavits outlining the steps taken to comply with this Court's Order, including the attempts made to personally serve Defendant Alexander, whether Defendant Alexander was served by certified mail, return receipt requested, and, simultaneously, by ordinary mail, and whether the insurance carrier has been or will be served. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 7/13/2022. (smf) |
||
Tuesday, July 12, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for COMPLAINT served on FREDA ALEXANDER A/K/A FRIEDA ALEXANDER on 06/03/2022, filed by MICHEL ESTIVERNE. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER granting16 Motion for Alternative Service; Plaintiff shall attempt service of the summons and complaint upon Defendant Alexander by personal service three additional times by 7/1/2022, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 6/1/2022. (mxw) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() First MOTION ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT, FREDA ALEXANDER by MICHEL ESTIVERNE. (COSTELLO, EDWARD) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 05/06 4:20 PM
Set Deadlines as to16 First MOTION ALTERNATIVE SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT, FREDA ALEXANDER . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw) |
||
Wednesday, May 04, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER granting Plaintiff's14 Letter request to reinstate Defendant Freda Alexander to the active docket for an additional 30 days; Granting leave to file a Motion for Alternative Service; and granting leave to file a Motion to have Defendant's insurance carrier served on behalf of Defendant. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 5/4/2022. (mxw) |
|
Tuesday, May 03, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Letter from Edward M. Costello, Esquire. (COSTELLO, EDWARD) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Summons Returned Unexecuted by MICHEL ESTIVERNE as to SAMUEL DELANEY BROWN. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
12 | 12
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for COMPLAINT served on SAMUEL DELANEY BROWN on 05/03/2022, filed by MICHEL ESTIVERNE. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice as to Defendant FREDA ALEXANDER pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m); FREDA ALEXANDER terminated. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 4/25/2022. (mxw) |
|
Thursday, April 14, 2022 | ||
qc
QC - Improper Default Request
Thu 04/14 11:40 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Default submitted by MICHEL ESTIVERNE on 4/13/2022 cannot be granted as requested because service was not effectuated pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (km) |
||
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Request for Default by MICHEL ESTIVERNE against FREDA ALEXANDER AKA FRIEDA ALEXANDER. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER granting6 Motion for Service by Publication. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/4/2022. (jd) |
|
Thursday, March 31, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER re5 Extending Notice of Call for dismissal, Reset Motion deadline to 4/22/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 3/31/2022. (jd) |
|
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Letter from Edward M. Costello, Esquire. (COSTELLO, EDWARD) |
|
Thursday, March 24, 2022 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/24 12:45 PM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION for Service by Publication . Motion set for 4/18/2022 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) |
||
Wednesday, March 23, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION for Service by Publication by MICHEL ESTIVERNE.(SIMON, MARC) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 4/1/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (lr, ) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/21 2:52 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Magistrate Judge James B. Clark no longer assigned to the case. (sbg, ) |
||
Friday, March 11, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() AFFIDAVIT of Service for COMPLAINT served on FREDA ALEXANDER A/K/A FRIEDA ALEXANDER on 01/24/2022, filed by MICHEL ESTIVERNE. (SIMON, MARC) |
|
Wednesday, February 16, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD COSTELLO, III on behalf of MICHEL ESTIVERNE (COSTELLO, EDWARD) |
|
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to FREDA ALEXANDER, SAMUEL DELANEY BROWN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) |
|
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against FREDA ALEXANDER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12996445) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHEL ESTIVERNE.(SIMON, MARC) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 11/22 2:03 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, ) |