Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-06082

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Eddward P Ballinger Jr
Case #: 2:21-ap-00303
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2021
Terminated:Apr 10, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Marilyn Miglin, L.P.
Represented By
Marilyn Miglin, L.P.
contact info
Defendant
MARLENA CARTER
3921 W IVANHOE ST UNIT 180
CHANDLER, AZ 85226
Represented By
MARLENA CARTER
contact info
Defendant
STEVEN CARTER
3921 W IVANHOE ST UNIT 180
CHANDLER, AZ 85226
Represented By
STEVEN CARTER
contact info
Plaintiff
Marilyn Miglin, L.P.
14300 N. Northsight Blvd Suite 115
Scottsdale, AZ 85260
Represented By
JONATHAN P. IBSEN
Canterbury Law Group, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM MST
Monday, April 10, 2023
26 26 order oJudgment Mon 04/10 3:07 PM
Stipulated Judgment signed on 4/10/2023 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation
court Close Adversary Mon 04/10 3:08 PM
Adversary Terminated . (SJF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
25 25 vCal Virtual Minute Entry Thu 04/06 8:21 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 04/06/2023 Subject: STATUS CONFERENCE Appearances: NONE Proceedings: VACATED: STIPULATION FILED. (vCal Hearing ID (1592869)). (DMS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
24 24 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 04/05 1:03 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by CHRISTOPHER JAMES DUTKIEWICZ of DM Bankruptcy Law Group, LLC on behalf of MARLENA CARTER, STEVEN CARTER. (DUTKIEWICZ, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Order
Thursday, March 23, 2023
23 23 vCal Minute Entry Thu 03/23 3:53 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 03/23/2023 Subject: STATUS CONFERENCE (vCal Hearing ID (1591602)). HEARING Scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing. (DMS)
Related: [-]
22 22 audio Thu 03/23 10:45 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 03/23/2023 10:00 AM ]. File Size [ 867 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:51 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1591602)).(KMD, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
21 21 vCal Minute Entry Mon 02/27 9:06 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 02/23/2023 Subject: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (vCal Hearing ID (1578269)). HEARING Scheduled for 03/23/2023 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hearing. (DMS)
Related: [-]
20 20 audio Fri 02/24 10:14 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 02/23/2023 10:00 AM ]. File Size [ 711 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:31 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1578269)).(KMD, )
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 02/23 8:17 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Approving Stipulation filed by CHRISTOPHER JAMES DUTKIEWICZ of DM Bankruptcy Law Group, LLC on behalf of MARLENA CARTER, STEVEN CARTER Related [+]. (DUTKIEWICZ, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Order
18 18 other Stipulation Thu 02/23 8:02 AM
Stipulation to Non-Dischargeability filed by CHRISTOPHER JAMES DUTKIEWICZ of DM Bankruptcy Law Group, LLC on behalf of MARLENA CARTER, STEVEN CARTER. (DUTKIEWICZ, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
17 17 vCal Minute Entry Wed 06/15 4:55 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 06/14/2022 Subject: RULE 16B SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (vCal Hearing ID (1575816)). Related [+](DMS)
Related: [-] 12
16 16 audio Tue 06/14 1:59 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 06/14/2022 01:30 PM ]. File Size [ 1,632 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:29 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1575816)).(WES, )
Related: [-]
15 15 other Stipulation Tue 06/14 10:33 AM
Stipulation Stipulated Discovery Plan filed by JONATHAN P. IBSEN of CANTERBURY LAW GROUP, LLP on behalf of Marilyn Miglin, L.P.. (IBSEN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 05/12 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures
13 13 order oSetting Scheduling Conference and Procedures Form (Tel or Vid) Tue 05/10 9:23 AM
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures signed on 5/10/2022 Related [+]. Telephonic hearing set for 6/14/2022 at 01:30 p.m. (DMS)
Related: [-] 12 Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/04 9:00 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by CHRISTOPHER JAMES DUTKIEWICZ of D.M. Bankruptcy Law Group, LLC on behalf of MARLENA CARTER, STEVEN CARTER Related [+]. (DUTKIEWICZ, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
11 11 notice Certificate of Service Tue 04/05 8:10 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint on Defendants filed by JONATHAN P. IBSEN of CANTERBURY LAW GROUP, LLP on behalf of Marilyn Miglin, L.P.. (IBSEN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
10 10 court Summons Issued (Form) Mon 04/04 10:42 AM
Summons Issued . (SAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
9 9 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/01 3:31 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by JONATHAN P. IBSEN of CANTERBURY LAW GROUP, LLP on behalf of Marilyn Miglin, L.P.. (IBSEN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/01 3:29 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by JONATHAN P. IBSEN of CANTERBURY LAW GROUP, LLP on behalf of Marilyn Miglin, L.P.. (IBSEN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
7 7 order oExtend Mon 03/28 8:53 AM
ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Make Service Related [+] signed on 3/28/2022 . (RIV)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
6 6 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 03/23 4:59 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Extending Time for Service filed by JONATHAN P. IBSEN of CANTERBURY LAW GROUP, LLP on behalf of Marilyn Miglin, L.P. Related [+]. (IBSEN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-] 2 Order Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order
5 5 motion Extend (Motion to) Wed 03/23 4:54 PM
Motion to Extend Time for Service filed by JONATHAN P. IBSEN of CANTERBURY LAW GROUP, LLP on behalf of Marilyn Miglin, L.P. Related [+]. (IBSEN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-] 2 Order Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, March 21, 2022
4 4 other Change of Address Mon 03/21 1:04 PM
Change of Address filed by CHRISTOPHER JAMES DUTKIEWICZ of D.M. Bankruptcy Law Group, LLC on behalf of MARLENA CARTER, STEVEN CARTER. (DUTKIEWICZ, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 03/05 10:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary
2 2 order oPotential Dismissal of Adversary - VAN Form Thu 03/03 10:53 AM
ORDER Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary . (RIV)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/22 4:21 PM
Adversary case 2:21-ap-00303. Complaint (350.00 fee) against Marilyn Miglin, L.P., MARLENA CARTER, STEVEN CARTER filed by JONATHAN P. IBSEN of CANTERBURY LAW GROUP, LLP on behalf of Marilyn Miglin, L.P. Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) 65 (Dischargeability - other) . (IBSEN, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]