Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tiiara NA Patton
Case #: 6:21-bk-61491
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Jul 28, 2022

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Squirrels Research Labs LLC
8050 Freedom Ave NW
North Canton, OH 44720-6912
Represented By
Marc Merklin
Brouse Mcdowell, Lpa
contact info
Creditor
Avnet, Inc.
Creditor
Better PC, LLC
Creditor
Carl Forsell
Creditor
Cincinnati Insurance Company
Creditor
Envista Forensics, LLC d/b/a AREPA
Creditor
Fleur-de-Lis Development, LLC
Creditor
Ohio Bureau of Workers Compensation
Creditor
Premier Bank
Creditor
Torea Consulting Ltd.
Debtor
Squirrels Research Labs LLC
Debtor
The Midwest Data Company LLC
Interested Party
Instantiation LLC
Interested Party
Ohio Power Company dba American Electric Power
Interested Party
SCEB, LLC
Trustee
Frederic P. Schwieg
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee

GPO May 02 2022
Memorandum of Opinion signed on 5/2/2022 (re-docketed for reporting purposes only) (RE: related document(s)227 Memorandum of Opinion). (lbald crt)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
385 385 notice Notice of Substitution of Attorney Wed 05/21 9:44 AM
Notice of Substitution of Attorney. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (ust47, Lauren Schoenewald tr)
Related: [-]