Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-03170
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2021
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Sunday May 22, 2022 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ROBERT GUMARANG QUIDILLA
Represented By
GARY ANTHONY ANDERSON
Environmental Litigation Group Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/10 7:02 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/23 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6558604.), filed by ROBERT GUMARANG QUIDILLA. (ANDERSON, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet