Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-03166
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2021
Last checked: Sunday May 22, 2022 5:26 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
GARY L. MOORE
Represented By
KYLE CHRISTOPHER USNER
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys - Metairie La
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
3 3 transfer Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 11/23 2:02 PM
Case transferred in from Gainesville Division Division on 11/23/2021 Case Number 1:21-cv-192. (djb)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/23 1:57 PM
ORDER - The Clerk is hereby directed to assign all actions filed in, removed to, or transferred to this district which relate to, or seek damages from use of, the 3M Combat Arms Earplugs to the undersigned in the Pensacola Division. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/23/2019. (djb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/23 1:50 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6558457.), filed by GARY L. MOORE. (USNER, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet