California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:21-cv-09213
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Nov 24, 2021
Terminated:Sep 16, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 23, 2022 2:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Hori U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Daniel N Yannuzzi
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Sofya Asatryan
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton
contact info
Darren M. Franklin
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Laura L Chapman
Sheppard Mullin Richter And Hampton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
OKYN Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas James Daly
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Syed A Hasan
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info
Siho Yoo
Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, September 16, 2024
70 70 order Dismissing Case Mon 09/16 12:31 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE69 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. It is ordered that this action be, and hereby is, DISMISSED with prejudice as to all claims for relief, causes of action, and parties. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
69 69 stip Dismiss Case Wed 09/11 10:32 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff OKYN Holdings, Inc..(Daly, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order