Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-03271
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Nov 24, 2021
Last checked: Monday May 23, 2022 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
THOMAS THORONDOR WEST
Represented By
GARY ANTHONY ANDERSON
Environmental Litigation Group Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, November 29, 2021
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Mon 11/29 8:23 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILER When entering party names please enter full names as it is listed on the Complaint. 3M COMPANY Party name corrected by Clerk. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/24 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6560434.), filed by THOMAS THORONDOR WEST. (ANDERSON, GARY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet