Original Case: 1:18-cv-12155

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-02896
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2021
Terminated:Mar 04, 2022
Last checked: Monday Mar 07, 2022 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
Adrien Broner
Defendant
About Billions, LLC
Defendant - Appellant
Ravone Littlejohn
Represented By
Arnold Joseph
Joseph and Associates
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Pristine Jewelers NY, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Alan Kaufman
Matthew A. Kaufman, Esq.
contact info
David A. Schrader
Paykin Krieg & Adams PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/07/2022 3:27 AM EST
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ravone Littlejohn, FILED. [3217625] 21-2896 [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:41 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 15 pgs Case FILED
2 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/08/2021, RECEIVED.[3217633] 21-2896 [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:47 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3217634] 21-2896 [Entered: 11/24/2021 09:48 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 15 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED