Dale v. Citigroup Global Markets
Original Case: 7:12-cv-00082
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-40874 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 24, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 08, 2022 2:28 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Citigroup Global Markets, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Salomon Smith Barney, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Citigroup Funding, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Citigroup, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Morgan Stanley Smith Barney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Roy S. Dale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Katie P. Klein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dale & Klein Family Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
K&R Family Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/08/2022 2:28 AM CST |
Wednesday, November 24, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Roy S. Dale, Dale & Klein Family Partnership, K&R Family Limited Partnership and Ms. Katie P. Klein 21-40874 (ABT) |