Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00778
Case Filed:Oct 28, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Nov 27, 2021 2:19 AM EST
Defendant
John Comer (1)
Represented By
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Michael A. Sullivan
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/27/2021 2:38 AM EST
Thursday, September 30, 2021
Arrest of John P. Comer (1) on 9/30/2021. (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to John P. Comer (1). (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
1 1 Complaint as to John P. Comer (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 9/30/2021.. (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, October 01, 2021
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Michael J. O'Shea for John P. Comer. Counsel is reminded of their obligation to report significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. CJA Plan, Part IV (D)(2). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/1/2021. (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Initial Appearance as to John P. Comer (1) held on 10/1/2021. All parties appeared and consented to participating via video conference. Bryson Gillard present as counsel for the government; Michael O'Shea present and appointed as counsel for the defendant; defendant also present. Government advised of obligations pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act. Defendant waived his right to a preliminary hearing. The court finds that probable cause has been established, and bound this case over to the grand jury for further proceedings. Defendant consented on the record to having Attorney O'Shea sign the waiver of preliminary hearing on his behalf. The government moved for detention; government's motion for detention granted on a temporary basis. Detention Hearing set for 10/7/2021 at 01:00 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter/ECRO: S. Siner. Pretrial: T. Jennings. Time: 15 minutes). (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order regarding use of video conference/teleconferencing as to John P. Comer (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/1/2021. (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order as to John P. Comer (1). Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court reminds the government of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), to disclose evidence favorable to the defendant and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment. The government is ordered to comply with Brady and its progeny. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including dismissal of the indictment or information, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, sanctions by the Court or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/1/2021. (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order of TEMPORARY Detention pending hearing as to John P. Comer (1). Detention Hearing set for 10/7/2021 at 01:00 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/1/2021. (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by John P. Comer (1). (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 07, 2021
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Pretrial as to John P. Comer (1) held on 10/7/2021. All parties appeared by video conference. Bryson Gillard present as counsel for the government; Michael O'Shea present as counsel for the defendant; defendant also present. Defense counsel made an oral motion for a continuance of the hearing; Government did not object; the court granted same. Detention Hearing reset for 10/18/2021 at 03:00 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter/ECRO: B. Laster. Time: 10 minutes). (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
10 10 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 9/30/2021 in case as to John P. Comer (1). (L,Br) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. Detention Hearing as to John P. Comer (1) held on 10/18/2021. All parties appeared and consented to participating via video conference. Michael Sullivan present as counsel for the government; Michael O'Shea present as counsel for the defendant; defendant also present. The government presented testimony from Special Agent Preetham Rao who was cross examined by the defense. The government also proffered the report of pretrial services and the complaint with attached affidavit. Arguments were made by the parties. The court granted the government's motion for detention. Defendant ordered remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal pending further proceedings. (Court Reporter/ECRO: K. Malley. Pretrial: T. Jennings. Time: 1 hour). (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
8 8 Order regarding use of video conference/teleconferencing as to John P. Comer (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/18/2021. (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Detention pending trial as to John P. Comer (1). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 10/18/2021. (D,JJ) [1:21-mj-03282-TMP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 28, 2021
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (W,CM)
Related: [-]
11 11 Indictment filed by USA as to John Comer (1) count(s) 1, 2. (W,CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page