Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Harvey Bartle, III
Case #: 2:21-cv-05279
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2021
Terminated:Dec 06, 2022
Last checked: Monday May 30, 2022 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
MERCK & CO., INC.
Represented By
DINO S. SANGIAMO
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By
DINO S. SANGIAMO
Venable LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CONSUELO GARCIA
Represented By
ADAM T. FUNK
Potts Law Firm
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2022
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 458. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/6/22. 12/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE 18md2848; DOC 1141) (mbh)
GPO Dec 06 2022
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 458 THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE GROUP A CASES IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/6/22. 12/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE 18md2848; DOC 1142) (mbh)

Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
12 12 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Thu 06/29 11:18 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 483 THAT THE MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE KORI WESTBROOK AS COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF IN PLACE OF ADAM FUNK. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 6/28/23. 6/29/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO LIAISON COUNSEL )(mbh) (SEE 18md2848; DOC #1211)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
11 11 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 06/23 7:33 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Kori Westbrook filed by CONSUELO GARCIA..(Westbrook, Kori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
10 10 52 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 12/07 5:08 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 458 THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE GROUP A CASES IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/6/22. 12/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE 18md2848; DOC 1142) (mbh)
Related: [-]
9 9 14 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Wed 12/07 5:05 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 458. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 12/6/22. 12/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE 18md2848; DOC 1141) (mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
8 8 respm Response in Support of Motion Wed 10/19 10:37 AM
RESPONSE in Support re6 MOTION to Dismiss Group A Cases or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment regarding (Doc. 1101) Opposition filed by Potts Law Firm filed by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..(HARDWAY, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-14
Friday, October 07, 2022
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/07 6:14 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss Group A Cases or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by CONSUELO GARCIA.(FUNK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
6 6 motion Dismiss Wed 09/14 8:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Group A Cases or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(Roberts, Michaela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-22,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/30 7:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CONSUELO GARCIA. MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. waiver sent on 12/21/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. (FUNK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/30 7:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CONSUELO GARCIA. MERCK & CO., INC. waiver sent on 12/21/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. (FUNK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/22 8:33 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP..(SANGIAMO, DINO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/02 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DINO S. SANGIAMO on behalf of MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. with Certificate of Service(SANGIAMO, DINO)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 12/02 11:38 AM
Summons Issued as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/2/21 (bw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 12/01 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15583362.), filed by CONSUELO GARCIA.(FUNK, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form