Connecticut District Court
Judge:Stefan R Underhill
Case #: 3:21-cv-01597
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2021
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 30, 2022 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Branford Board Of Education
Represented By
Alexandria L. Voccio
Howd & Ludorf
contact info
Plaintiff
Erin Burris
Represented By
Elizabeth Knight Adams
Law Offices Of Elizabeth Knight Adams, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
41 41 order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/31 2:27 PM
ORDER. This case has been reported settled. Rather than keeping it open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening within 30 days of this order. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the court or simply for inclusion in the court's file), they may do so within 30 days of this order. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 3/31/2025. (Markowitz, C)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Mon 03/31 2:58 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey Related [+]
Related: [-] is, J
Thursday, March 27, 2025
40 40 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 03/27 9:04 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert A. Richardson: Settlement Conference held on 3/26/2025. The case settled. Total Time: 7 hours and 1 minutes (Swann, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
39 39 utility Calendar Entry Wed 02/26 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. A virtual settlement conference is set for 3/26/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Robert A. Richardson. (Fries, J.)
Related: [-]
38 38 5 pgs order Order Wed 02/26 10:17 AM
ORDER: A virtual settlement conference is scheduled for 10:30 AM on 3/26/25 with Judge Richardson. Please see attached order for important information. Counsel have been provided with zoom information via email. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 2/26/2025. (Fries, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
37 37 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 10/09 4:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert A. Richardson: Pre-Settlement Conference call held on 10/9/2024. 5 minutes. (Onikuyide, O)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
36 36 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 10/03 4:52 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for settlement purposes. Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/3/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] is, J
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
35 35 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 10/02 3:01 PM
ORDER granting34 MOTION for Extension of Time until 45 days after settlement conference to File a Dispositive Motion. The Clerk shall refer this matter to a United States Magistrate Judge for settlement purposes. Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/2/2024. (Markowitz, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
34 34 motion Extension of Time Fri 09/27 3:08 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 45 days after settlement conference to File a Dispositive Motion by Branford Board Of Education. (Voccio, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 12/20 1:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 12/20/2023. Total Time: 0 hours and 12 minutes (Markowitz, C.)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 12/20 1:33 PM
ORDER approving29 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 9/1/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2024. Signed by Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/20/2023. (Markowitz, C.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
utility Calendar Entry Mon 12/11 10:58 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 12/20/2023 11:30 AM before Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is 888.636.3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650 8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Markowitz, C.)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/08 1:49 PM
ORDER: The motion to extend time to serve responses to discovery to 1/20/2024 is granted. Signed by Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/8/2023. (Khabbaz, D.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
29 29 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 12/07 10:26 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Voccio, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
28 28 motion Extension of Time Wed 12/06 11:53 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/20/24 To Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Branford Board Of Education. (Voccio, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/13 12:40 PM
Answer to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Branford Board Of Education.(Voccio, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
26 26 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/23 6:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Plaintiffs, filed by Erin Burris.(Adams, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redlined Complaint
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
25 25 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 07/11 3:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 7/11/2023. 20 Second Motion to Dismiss filed by Branford Board Of Education is DENIED without prejudice. Total Time: 36 minutes (Court Reporter: Melissa Cianciullo) Related [+]
Related: [-] is, Julia
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
utility Calendar Entry Wed 05/24 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 20 set for 7/11/2023 01:00 PM in Courtroom One, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. (Guerrier, C.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 10/25 11:20 PM
REPLY to Response to20 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by Branford Board Of Education. (Voccio, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
22 22 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/13 9:01 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re20 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by Erin Burris. (Adams, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 10/12 6:52 PM
ORDER denying as moot17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/12/2022. (Guerrier, C.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
20 20 motion Dismiss Thu 09/22 12:22 PM
Second MOTION to Dismiss by Branford Board Of Education.Responses due by 10/13/2022(Voccio, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support MOL
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
19 19 respm Objection Tue 09/20 10:18 PM
OBJECTION re17 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failing to Comply with Order filed by Erin Burris. (Adams, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/20 9:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Branford Board Of Education, filed by Erin Burris.(Adams, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Tue 09/20 4:22 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Failing to Comply with Order by Branford Board Of Education.Responses due by 10/11/2022 (Voccio, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 07/18 3:22 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff, Erin Burris, moves to amend her complaint15 to address the deficiencies discussed in the Defendant's motion to dismiss. Rule 15 provides that "[t]he court should freely" grant leave to amend "when justice so requires." Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2); see also Block v. First Blood Assocs. , 988 F.2d 344, 350 (2d Cir. 1993) ("The rule in this Circuit has been to allow a party to amend its pleadings in the absence of a showing by the nonmovant of prejudice or bad faith."). The Defendant has not objected to the motion. Accordingly, Burris's motion to amend15 is granted. Burris is directed to file the amended complaint, which will become the operative complaint upon filing. The Defendant's motion to dismiss 12 is denied without prejudice in light of the amended complaint that will be filed. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/18/2022. (Guerrier, C.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
15 15 motion Amend/Correct Mon 06/20 7:44 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Erin Burris.Responses due by 7/11/2022(Adams, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint - Redlined,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint - Clean,
Att: 3 Memorandum in Support
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 04/26 6:26 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time until May 5, 2022 to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/26/2022. (Guerrier, C.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
13 13 motion Extension of Time Mon 04/25 1:35 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time until May 5, 2022 Response to Motion to Dismiss12 MOTION to Dismiss by Erin Burris. (Adams, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
12 12 motion Dismiss Mon 04/04 11:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Branford Board Of Education.Responses due by 4/25/2022(Voccio, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 02/23 4:54 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/23/22. (Guerrier, C.)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 02/23 4:56 PM
Answer deadline updated for Branford Board Of Education to 4/4/2022. (Guerrier, C.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 21, 2022
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/21 5:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erin Burris. Branford Board Of Education served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (Adams, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/15 11:20 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/30/2022. (Guerrier, C.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/14 12:01 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2022 to file a response to plaintiff complaint1 Complaint by Branford Board Of Education. (Voccio, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/14 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria L. Voccio on behalf of Branford Board Of Education (Voccio, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
7 7 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 01/20 12:51 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Branford Board Of Education* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Elizabeth Knight Adams* *Law Offices of Elizabeth Knight Adams, P.C.* *41B New London Tpke., Suite 7C* *Glastonbury, CT 06033*. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Thu 01/20 11:56 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Branford Board Of Education. (Adams, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
6 6 order Electronic Service Documents Thu 12/02 8:49 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of3 Electronic Filing Order,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Complaint filed by Erin Burris,4 Standing Protective Order,5 Notice Re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 12/2/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
5 5 notice Notice Thu 12/02 8:46 AM
NOTICE RE: INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Initial Discovery Protocols Attachment
4 4 order Protective Order Thu 12/02 8:44 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Electronic Filing Order Thu 12/02 8:43 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 12/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Thu 12/02 8:41 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2022. Discovery due by 6/2/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 7/7/2022. Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2021.(Fazekas, J.)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/01 10:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Erin Burris ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6741637.), filed by Erin Burris.(Adams, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 12/02 8:14 AM
Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]