New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-00835
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2021
Terminated:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday Dec 03, 2021 2:19 AM EST
Defendant
MUKARAM GAZI (1)
Represented By
ANTHONY JAMES MAHAJAN
Frier Levitt LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
ADAM MICHAEL BAKER
Department Of Justice
contact info

GPO Nov 30 2021
CONSENT ORDER as to MUKARAM GAZI Re: Video conferencing.. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/30/2021. (jmm, )
GPO Nov 30 2021
BRADY ORDER as to MUKARAM GAZI. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/30/2021. (jmm, )
GPO Dec 01 2021
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to MUKARAM GAZI (1) 2,000,000.00(unsecured) (Finance notified) with reporting to Pretrial Services; travel restricted to NJ, NY & PA with notice given to Pretrial for other domestic travel; abstain from the use of alcohol, surrender all travel document to Pretrial; Not apply for new travel documents. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/30/2021. (jmm, )
GPO Dec 07 2021
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to MUKARAM GAZI - Time excluded from 12/7/2021 until 2/7/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/7/2021. (abr, )
GPO Dec 29 2022
STANDING ORDER 21-011 In Re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19. Ordered that the period of December 29, 2021 through January 31, 2022 shall be excluded from all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act. as to MUKARAM GAZI Time excluded from 12/29/2021 until 1/31/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/29/2021. (jmm, )
GPO Jul 18 2022
SCHEDULING ORDER as to MUKARAM GAZI Status Conference set for 11/14/2022 11:30 AM in Video Conference before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson.. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 7/18/2022. (jmm, )

Docket last updated: 03/14/2025 9:02 PM EDT
Thursday, November 04, 2021
1 1 17 pgs INDICTMENT as to MUKARAM GAZI (1) counts 1, 2, 3, 4. (jmh)
Related: [-]