New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joanna Seybert
Referred: Steven I Locke
Case #: 2:21-cv-06695
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2021
Terminated:Jun 30, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 31, 2022 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Represented By
Richard S. Naidich
Naidich Wurman LLP
contact info
Robert P. Johnson
Naidich Wurman LLP
contact info
Lauren Valle
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Baron Auto Emporium
Represented By
Jessica D. Klotz
Lewis, Johs, Avallone, Aviles & Kaufman, LLP
contact info
Richard S. Naidich
Naidich Wurman LLP
contact info
Robert P. Johnson
Naidich Wurman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sandip Chattopadhyay
Represented By
Daniel Adam Schlanger
Schlanger Law Group, LLP
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Maomita Kundu
Represented By
Daniel Adam Schlanger
Schlanger Law Group, LLP
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
Consumer Litigation Associates
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Baron Cohen Auto Group, Inc.
Terminated: 02/07/2022


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Friday, June 30, 2023
38 38 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 06/30 11:08 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re:37 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice; The Clerk of the Court is directed to mark this case CLOSED. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 6/30/2023. (CV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
37 37 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 06/29 12:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a) by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
36 36 misc Status Report Fri 06/02 1:33 PM
STATUS REPORT Status Update and Request to Adjourn Conference Sine Die (Or Convert to Telephonic Conference) by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu (Marchiando, Craig)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Fri 06/02 11:57 PM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: On consent and based on the representations in DE36 , the status conference previously scheduled for 6/5/2023 is adjourned to 7/19/2023 at 2:30 p.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/2/2023. (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
35 35 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/16 11:50 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Status Conference held on 5/16/2023. The parties represent that settlement negotiations are back on track. The parties will either settle this case prior to June 5, 2023 or appear in person on at that date at 11:30am to schedule outstanding discovery on an expedited basis. Status Conference set for 6/5/2023 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 5/16/2023. (KG)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 04/28 9:24 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE34 Motion to Adjourn Conference. On consent, the status conference set for 5/2/2023 is adjourned to 5/16/2023 at 11:30 a.m. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/28/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
34 34 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 04/27 4:44 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Telephonic) Currently Scheduled for May 2, 2023 by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu. (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
33 33 misc Letter Mon 04/24 5:15 PM
Letter from all defendants in response to plaintiffs' letter stating intent to resume litigation by Baron Auto Emporium (Klotz, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 23, 2023
32 32 misc Status Report Sun 04/23 3:08 PM
STATUS REPORT (and Notice of Plaintiffs' Intent To Proceed) by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
order Scheduling Order Mon 04/10 9:38 AM
Electronic SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar and based on the parties' representations in DE31 that the case has settled in principle, the final pretrial conference set for 4/26/2023 is converted to a status conference and adjourned to 5/2/2023 at 11:30 a.m. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. The parties are ordered to file stipulation of dismissal on or before 4/24/2023. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed, the 5/2/2023 status conference will be cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/10/2023. (LP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
31 31 misc Status Report Thu 03/23 2:36 PM
STATUS REPORT regarding Settlement by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
order Scheduling Order Tue 02/07 8:52 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: re30 Status Report. As per the Parties' representations in their joint status report, on or before March 23, 2023 , the Parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal or otherwise provide a status report regarding the finalization of settlement. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 2/7/2023. (LWC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
30 30 misc Status Report Mon 02/06 1:54 PM
STATUS REPORT regarding Settlement by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
29 29 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 12/21 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Settlement with All Parties by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
utility Email Test Wed 11/02 10:12 AM
Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (LC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 11/01 9:16 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Arjun Shah is hereby terminated as counsel for Plaintiffs. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to remove Arjun Shah from future ECF notifications. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/1/2022. (LP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
28 28 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/31 9:34 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu. (Shah, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
27 27 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 09/12 11:53 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Status Conference held on 9/12/2022. Discovery is ongoing. Deadline to commence summary judgment motion practice: April 14, 2023. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/26/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. in Courtroom 820 of the Central Islip Courthouse. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 9/12/2022. (Gandiosi, Kristin)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/12 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Arjun Shah on behalf of Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu (aty to be noticed) (Shah, Arjun)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
25 25 notice Notice of Consent to Change Attorney Fri 05/20 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Jessica D. Klotz (Klotz, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/19 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica D. Klotz on behalf of Baron Auto Emporium (notification declined or already on case) (Klotz, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 27, 2022
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/27 11:26 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadlines set; see attached order. Next Tele-Status Conference set for 9/12/2022 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/27/2022. (Gandiosi, Kristin) (Main Document 23 replaced on 4/27/2022) (Gandiosi, Kristin)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Initial Conference Hearing Wed 04/27 11:24 AM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke:Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/27/2022. The court has adopted and So Ordered the joint proposed scheduling order21 submitted by the parties. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 4/27/2022. (Gandiosi, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
21 21 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 04/25 9:17 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu (Marchiando, Craig)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/24 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Naidich on behalf of Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Naidich, Richard)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/24 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Johnson on behalf of Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Johnson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/08 2:58 PM
INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: A Tele-Initial Conference is set for 4/27/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. The parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and enter access code 3002871# at the prompt. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 3/8/2022. (Gandiosi, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SIL Individual Rules,
Att: 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet
Monday, March 07, 2022
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 03/07 11:20 AM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint, by Baron Auto Emporium. (Johnson, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/07 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Naidich on behalf of Baron Auto Emporium (aty to be noticed) (Naidich, Richard)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/07 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Johnson on behalf of Baron Auto Emporium (aty to be noticed) (Johnson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/03 12:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu. Baron Auto Emporium served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/18 2:24 PM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.. (Valle, Lauren)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/18 2:17 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.. (Valle, Lauren)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/18 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Valle on behalf of Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Valle, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 02/08 12:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Baron Auto Emporium. (Valle, Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/07 9:27 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint Filed on Consent of Defendant Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. against Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., Baron Auto Emporium, filed by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu. (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons on Baron Auto Emporium
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Tue 02/01 11:17 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE8 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. Without opposition, the motion to amend the caption and Complaint is granted. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to amend the caption in accordance with DE8 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 2/1/2022. (Pincsak, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
8 8 motion Amend/Correct/Supplement Mon 01/24 8:38 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement1 Complaint, Motion for Leave to Amend Caption and Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu. (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, First Amended Complaint, Redlined,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, First Amended Complaint, Clean
Thursday, January 20, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/20 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Carley Marchiando on behalf of Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu (aty to be noticed) (Marchiando, Craig)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/22 9:54 AM
Electronic ORDER granting DE6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendant Capital One Auto Finance to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 2/15/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 12/22/2021. (Pincsak, Lydia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/21 2:19 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu. (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 12, 2021
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Sun 12/12 5:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu. Baron Cohen Auto Group, Inc. served on 12/10/2021, answer due 12/31/2021. (Schlanger, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 12/03 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons #2
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 12/03 3:22 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/03 3:21 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 02, 2021
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 12/02 10:56 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 12/02 10:54 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Sandip Chattopadhyay, Maomita Kundu. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 12/02 10:55 AM
FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-15078165 (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]