Oklahoma State of et al v. Biden et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen P Friot |
Case #: | 5:21-cv-01136 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 31, 2022 3:49 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jeffrey A Koses
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Department of the Navy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Department of the Army
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Department of the Air Force
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Department of Defense
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John M Tenaglia
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rochelle Walensky
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
L Eric Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christine Wormuth
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Office of Personnel Management
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Office of Management and Budget
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shalanda D Young
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James M Murray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank Kendall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Karla S Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Services Administration
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lesley A Field
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carlos Del Toro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deanne Criswell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robin Carnahan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew C Blum
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph R Biden, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lloyd J Austin, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kiran Ahuja
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Zients
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Lott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory A Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J Kevin Stitt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Guernsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larissa Randell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Turner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Regina L Gritsavage, M.D.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Gritsavage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Goeppinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Coloney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oklahoma State of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John M O'Connor
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
16 Oklahoma Air National Guard Members
Terminated: 02/15/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |