Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-03072
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Dec 04, 2021 12:36 AM MST
Defendant
Amanda Rachelle Miller (1)
Represented By
Robert Clay Hernandez
Law Offices Of Hernandez & Hamilton PC
contact info
Jorge Leonardo Costales
Federal Public Defenders Office - Tucson
contact info
Barbara Tapper Catrillo
Catrillo Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael Richard Lizano
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/04/2021 1:16 AM MST
Thursday, November 12, 2020
Arrest of Patrick Michael La Fever, Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller on 11/12/2020. (CXE) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 13, 2020
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT as to Patrick Michael La Fever, Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller. (CXE) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Initial Appearance as to Amanda Rachelle Miller held on 11/13/2020. Defendant has consulted with an attorney and consents to appearing via tele-conference. The Court will take judicial notice of the PTS report and find the defendant is indigent and appoint counsel. Jorge Leonardo Costales is appointed counsel for Amanda Rachelle Miller with Appointment Type: AFPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Appearances : AUSA Heather Sechrist, duty for the Government, AFPD Attorney Jessica Murillo DeAlcoverde, duty for defendant. Defendant is present, consents to appearing via tele-conference and is in custody. Detention Hearing set for 11/18/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/18/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Related [+] Hearing held 2:20 pm to 4:00 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) Modified on 11/16/2020 to correct defense attorney designation; (BHA). [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
14 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau: Status Conference re: Detention / Preliminary Hearing as to Amanda Rachelle Miller held on 11/18/2020. The Court notes the Defendant could not be present for the hearing set this date due to medical reasons. Therefore, the Court orders the Detention / Preliminary Hearing RESET as reflected below. Defense counsel is granted leave to appear telephonically for the reset hearing. Appearances : AUSA Heather Sechrist present as attorney on duty for the Government; AFPD Leo Costales present for defendant. Defendant is not present and in custody. Detention / Preliminary Hearing RESET TO 11/23/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. Related [+] Hearing held 8:45 AM to 8:46 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LML) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Friday, November 20, 2020
15 15 MINUTE ORDER: Set/Reset Hearings as to Amanda Rachelle Miller. Detention / Preliminary Hearing is RESET as to Magistrate Judge ONLY. The Detention / Preliminary Hearing is RESET TO 11/23/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LML) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 23, 2020
16 16 (*MINUTE ENTRY Amended by #17) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Status Conference as to Amanda Rachelle Miller held on 11/23/2020. Due to defendant's status at Core Civic, the Detention and Preliminary Hearings scheduled for today are continued as indicated below. Appearances : AUSA Jackson Stephens, duty for the Government, AFPD Leo Costales for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera. Related [+] Hearing held 8:30 am to 8:45 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) Modified on 11/23/2020 (BHA). [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
17 17 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Amending Doc. 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald: Status Conference as to Amanda Rachelle Miller held on 11/23/2020. Due to defendant's status at Core Civic, the Detention and Preliminary Hearings scheduled for today are continued as indicated below. Appearances : AUSA Jackson Stephens, duty for the Government, AFPD Leo Costales for defendant. Defendant is not present and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/25/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera. Related [+] Hearing held 8:30 am to 8:45 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BHA) Reason for Amendment: Defendant was NOT present. [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
18 18 *Amended by 19 -MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich: Defendant consents to appear by video teleconference. Preliminary Hearing as to Amanda Rachelle Miller waived on 11/25/2020. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Status Conference regarding detention as to Amanda Rachelle Miller held on 11/25/2020. Pretrial Services recommends detention and the Government concurs. Defense counsel moves for a continuance and that defendant be screened for treatment. The Government objects to screening. Over the Government's objection, the Court grants defense counsel's oral motions and orders the defendant be screened for treatment. The Detention Hearing set 11/25/2020 at 8:30 AM is continued as set below. Appearances : AUSA Jonathan Granoff, attorney on duty for the Government, AFPD Leonardo Costales for defendant. Defendant is present by VTC and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 12/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. Related [+] Hearing held 8:33 AM to 9:15 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB) Modified on 11/25/2020 (SIB). [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
19 19 AMENDED MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera: Amending Doc. 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge *Maria S Aguilera: Defendant consents to appear by video teleconference. Preliminary Hearing as to Amanda Rachelle Miller waived on 11/25/2020. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Status Conference regarding detention as to Amanda Rachelle Miller held on 11/25/2020. Pretrial Services recommends detention and the Government concurs. Defense counsel moves for a continuance and that defendant be screened for treatment. The Government objects to screening. Over the Government's objection, the Court grants defense counsel's oral motions and orders the defendant be screened for treatment. The Detention Hearing set 11/25/2020 at 8:30 AM is continued as set below. Appearances : AUSA Jonathan Granoff, attorney on duty for the Government, AFPD Leonardo Costales for defendant. Defendant is present by VTC and in custody. Detention Hearing set for 12/9/2020 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. Related [+] Hearing held 8:33 AM to 9:15 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB) Reason for Amendment: To correct presiding judge. [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Wednesday, December 02, 2020
21 21 3 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Clay Hernandez appearing for Amanda Rachelle Miller . (Hernandez, Robert) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
25 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:21 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Association - Defendant filed by Amanda Rachelle Miller. Document not in compliance with LRCrim 57.3. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
22 22 4 pgs First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Patrick Michael La Fever, Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order
23 23 2 pgs ORDER granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Patrick Michael La Fever (1), Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). The time period between 11/12/20, and 1/11/21 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 12/7/20.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
26 26 3 pgs *MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Amanda Rachelle Miller. (Hernandez, Robert) *Document not in compliance with L.R.Civ.7.1(c); attorney notified on 12/10/2020 (ARC). [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
27 27 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro: Defense counsel moves for a substitution of counsel and states appointed AFPD Jorge Leonardo Costales agreed to allow him to sign the stipulation on his behalf. Defendant consents to the substitution of counsel on the record. The Court grants the substitution of counsel26 . Robert Clay Hernandez is retained counsel of record. Detention Hearing as to Amanda Rachelle Miller held on 12/9/2020. Over the Government's objection, the Court accepts recommendation by Pretrial Services and Orders defendant released on 12/16/2020 to The Haven. Defendant is advised on the record. Order Setting Conditions of Release signed. Defendant to be transported bag and baggage to the Tucson courthouse on 12/16/2020 to be released from cell block to The Haven. (see PDF for complete details) Related [+] Hearing held 8:34 AM to 10:09 AM.(SIB) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Att: 1 3 pgs Conditions of Release
Wednesday, December 16, 2020
32 32 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Amanda Rachelle Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 12/9/2020.(SGG) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2020
33 33 1 pgs NOTICE re: PASSPORT as to Amanda Rachelle Miller. Defendant is not permitted to apply for the issuance of a passport and/or passport card during the pendency of this action. (PTS-SA, ) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 06, 2021
36 36 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Patrick Michael La Fever, Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order
37 37 ORDER granting36 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Patrick Michael La Fever (1), Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). The time period between 11/12/20, and 2/10/21 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 1/6/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
40 40 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Amanda Rachelle Miller. (Hernandez, Robert) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
41 41 ORDER granting40 Motion to Withdraw Attorney as to Amanda Rachelle Miller (3).IT IS ORDERED the motion is GRANTED and therefore Retained Attorney, Robert Clay Hernandez, who has indicated he is no longer retained by Defendant, Amanda Rachelle Miller, and therefore is relieved of any further responsibilities in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 2/4/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
42 42 MOTION to Disclose Grand Jury Material by USA as to Patrick Michael La Fever, Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
43 43 ORDER granting42 Motion to Disclose Grand Jury Material as to Patrick Michael La Fever (1), Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). IT IS ORDERED that defense counsel shall not duplicate or otherwise disseminate the Grand Jury material produced pursuant to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 2/8/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
44 44 MOTION for Protective Order Governing Disclosure by USA as to Patrick Michael La Fever, Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
46 46 2 pgs ORDER granting44 Motion for Protective Order as to Patrick Michael La Fever (1), Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). IT IS ORDERED that the United States shall produce disclosure in this matter to counsel for the defendants, subject to the protections herein. Please see attached pdf for complete information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 2/9/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
50 50 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Patrick Michael La Fever, Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, February 12, 2021
51 51 ORDER granting50 Third Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Patrick Michael La Fever (1), Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). The time period between 11/12/20, and 3/12/21 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 2/12/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
56 56 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Patrick Michael La Fever, Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
57 57 ORDER granting56 Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Patrick Michael La Fever (1), Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). The time period between 11/12/20, and 4/11/21 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 3/10/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
58 58 Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Patrick Michael La Fever, Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 09, 2021
59 59 ORDER granting58 Fifth Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Patrick Michael La Fever (1), Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). The time period between 11/12/20, and 5/11/21 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 4/9/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
67 67 Sixth MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Patrick Michael La Fever, Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
68 68 ORDER granting67 Sixth Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Patrick Michael La Fever (1), Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). The time period between 11/12/20, and 6/10/21 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 5/4/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 04, 2021
70 70 Seventh MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 21, 2021
71 71 ORDER granting70 Seventh Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). The time period between 11/12/20, and 7/10/21 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 6/21/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
72 72 Eighth MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
73 73 ORDER granting72 Eighth Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). The time period between 11/12/20, and 8/9/21 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 7/6/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
74 74 1 pgs ORDER as to Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller setting a Pre-Indictment Status Conference for 7/26/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. Please see attached pdf for complete information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 7/12/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 13, 2021
75 75 ORDER as to Amanda Rachelle Miller. IT IS ORDERED CJA attorney, Barbara Catrillo, is appointed as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 7/12/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
76 76 2 pgs MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Pre-Indictment Status Conference as to Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller held on 7/26/2021. Interpreter N/A as to both defendants. Related [+] Hearing held 2:07 pm to 2:17 pm.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Friday, July 30, 2021
77 77 4 pgs Ninth MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict for 60 days (Unopposed) by USA as to Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
78 78 2 pgs ORDER granting77 Ninth Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). The time period between 11/12/20, and 10/8/21 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 8/3/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
79 79 5 pgs Tenth MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Jamaar Charles Samuels, Amanda Rachelle Miller.(Lizano, Michael) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
80 80 2 pgs ORDER granting79 Tenth Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Jamaar Charles Samuels (2), Amanda Rachelle Miller (3). The time period between 11/12/20, and 12/7/21 shall be excluded under the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 9/24/21.(CKS) [4:20-mj-02030-N/A-LCK]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
81 81 3 pgs INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Amanda Rachelle Miller (1) counts 1, 2, 3. (BAC)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
85 85 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Amanda Rachelle Miller. (ADI-MFR, )
Related: [-]