Oriental Republic of Uruguay v. Italba Corporation
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Melissa Damian |
Referred: | Melissa Damian |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-24264 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 06, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 10, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 04, 2022 5:03 AM EDT |
Mediator
Ricardo Jesus Cata
Upchurch Watson White & Max Mediation Group Suite 2030 2 S. Biscayne Blvd
Miami, FL 33130 |
|
Petitioner
Oriental Republic of Uruguay
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Italba Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Judgment
Fri 06/10 5:36 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Oriental Republic of Uruguay against Italba Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 6/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (mfo) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
18
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Wed 06/08 10:06 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part15 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 6/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (mfo) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 06/06 10:15 AM
ORDER DISCHARGING23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 6/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (mfo) |
|
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
29 | 29 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian: Motion Hearing held on 5/27/2022 re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Oriental Republic of Uruguay. Taking under Advisement; Order to follow. Total time in court: 1 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): David L. Gay, Jeffrey Michael Cohen, Gregory Stewart Grossman, and Carolina Zambrano Goncalves, (Digital 10:58:46) (jbs) | |
minutes
MOTION Hearing or Evidentiary Motion Hearing
Fri 05/27 12:11 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian: Motion Hearing held on 5/27/2022 re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Oriental Republic of Uruguay. Taking under Advisement; Order to follow. Total time in court: 1 hour(s). Attorney Appearance(s): David L. Gay, Jeffrey Michael Cohen, Gregory Stewart Grossman, and Carolina Zambrano Goncalves, (Digital 10:58:46) (jbs) |
||
Wednesday, May 25, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/25 4:19 PM
STIPULATION re22 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law STIPULATION REGARDING PETITIONERS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Italba Corporation, Oriental Republic of Uruguay (Grossman, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
27 | 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting26 Motion for Order Resetting Hearing. Hearing on15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and23 ORDER to Show Cause reset for 5/27/2022 at 11:00 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 5/11/2022. (mfo) | |
26 | 26
motion
Hearing
Wed 05/11 12:24 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re25 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Unopposed Motion for Order Resetting Hearing by Italba Corporation.(Cohen, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Wed 05/11 1:08 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting26 Motion for Order Resetting Hearing. Hearing on15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and23 ORDER to Show Cause reset for 5/27/2022 at 11:00 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 5/11/2022. (mfo) |
||
Tuesday, May 10, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Tue 05/10 3:26 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and23 ORDER to Show Cause. Hearing set for 5/19/2022 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 5/10/2022. See attached document for full details. (mfo) |
|
Monday, May 09, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
8
pgs
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Mon 05/09 3:51 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re23 Order to Show Cause by Italba Corporation.(Cohen, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 04/25 11:45 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 4/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (mfo) |
|
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/13 4:08 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Suspension of Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 4/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (mfo) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
utility
~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 03/21 9:57 AM
Active Hearings Before Prior Presider Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. (ch1) |
||
Thursday, March 17, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 03/17 5:03 PM
Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re16 MOTION for Suspension of Deadlines re13 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, In Support of filed by Oriental Republic of Uruguay. (Grossman, Gregory) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 03/17 5:00 PM
Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law In Support of filed by Oriental Republic of Uruguay. (Grossman, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 03/16 8:42 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for Trial. Judge Marcia G. Cooke no longer assigned as presider judge in case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
7
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 03/10 4:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Italba Corporation. Replies due by 3/17/2022. (Gay, David) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 03/10 4:46 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Suspension of Deadlines re13 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, filed by Italba Corporation. Attorney David L. Gay added to party Italba Corporation(pty:res). Replies due by 3/17/2022. (Gay, David) |
|
Friday, February 25, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 02/25 4:57 PM
MOTION for Suspension of Deadlines re13 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, by Oriental Republic of Uruguay. (Grossman, Gregory) |
|
15 | 15
7
pgs
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Fri 02/25 4:46 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Oriental Republic of Uruguay. (Grossman, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
adr
Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing
Wed 02/09 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Ricardo Jesus Cata as Mediator. (Grossman, Gregory) |
|
Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation
Tue 01/25 10:03 AM
ORDER Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines: ( Trial set for 2/27/2023 at 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Calendar Call set for 2/22/2023 at 3:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2021., Expert Discovery due by 4/29/2022., Fact Discovery due by 3/18/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2021., In Limine Motions due by 1/20/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 5/13/2022., Motions due by 5/13/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/20/2023.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 9/23/2022. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) [LINK:Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.] |
|
12 | 12
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Mon 01/24 2:29 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Oriental Republic of Uruguay(Grossman, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit D | ||
Monday, January 10, 2022 | ||
11 | 11 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) - 2022-5 to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan no longer assigned to case. (yar) | |
10 | 10
8
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/10 4:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Italba Corporation. (Nieuchowicz, Ilan) |
|
utility
Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/11 12:19 PM
Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) - 2022-5 to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan no longer assigned to case. (yar) |
||
Friday, January 07, 2022 | ||
9 | 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part8 Motion for Extension of Time. Response/Answer due by 5:00p.m. on 1/10/2022. This deadline will not be extended absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke (bai) | |
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 01/07 4:47 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Italba Corporation.(Nieuchowicz, Ilan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Fri 01/07 5:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part8 Motion for Extension of Time. Response/Answer due by 5:00p.m. on 1/10/2022. This deadline will not be extended absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke (bai) |
||
Monday, January 03, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part6 Motion for Extension of Time. Response/Answer due 1/7/2022. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke (bai) | |
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 01/03 11:57 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part6 Motion for Extension of Time. Response/Answer due 1/7/2022. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke (bai) |
||
Monday, December 27, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Mon 12/27 3:10 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Petition by Italba Corporation.(Nieuchowicz, Ilan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 12/27 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ilan Nieuchowicz on behalf of Italba Corporation. Attorney Ilan Nieuchowicz added to party Italba Corporation(pty:res). (Nieuchowicz, Ilan) |
|
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
11
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other
Tue 12/07 1:12 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters and ORDER Regarding Court Practices and Procedures. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/07 9:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Italba Corporation. (jas) |
|
Monday, December 06, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) | |
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/06 3:19 PM
COMPLAINT /Petition to Recognize and Enforce ICSID Arbitration Award against Italba Corporation. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15223037, filed by Oriental Republic of Uruguay.(Grossman, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s) Summons | ||
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 12/07 9:55 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) |