Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-17196

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:21-ap-01499
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Anthony J. Feorenzo, Jr.
83 Poplar Drive
Paramus, NJ 07652
Represented By
Anthony J. Feorenzo, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Valley National Bank
Represented By
David E. Mayland
Strasser And Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
court Order Authorizing Case Reassignment from RG to MEH Tue 05/06 9:52 AM
Text Order Authorizing Case Reassignment effective May 5, 2025: Judge Rosemary Gambardella removed from the case. Judge Mark E. Hall added to the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Christine M. Gravelle on 5/5/2025. (mhh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Thu 04/17 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
18 18 order File Settlement Documents Mon 04/14 10:41 AM
Order to File Settlement Documents. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/14/2025. Stipulation of Settlement Deadline is 5/14/2025. (rah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
court Hearing Held Wed 03/26 9:49 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Resolved; Stipulation of dismissal to be submitted Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 21-01499 Complaint by Valley National Bank against Anthony J. Feorenzo Jr.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) Filed by Plaintiff Valley National Bank) (car
Monday, February 24, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 02/24 2:10 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2/26/2025 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2025 at 10:00 AM, RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 21-01499 Complaint by Valley National Bank against Anthony J. Feorenzo Jr.. Fee Amount $ 350. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) Filed by Plaintiff Valley National Bank
Thursday, January 02, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 01/02 1:23 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from Jan. 9, 2025. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 ,2 Trial date set for 2/26/2025 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm
Thursday, October 10, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 10/10 10:54 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from Oct. 23, 2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 2 Summons Trial date set for 1/9/2025 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm
Friday, August 09, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 08/09 11:19 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 9/26/2024 Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 21-01499 Complaint by Valley National Bank against Anthony J. Feorenzo Jr.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud, Filed by Plaintiff Valley National Bank) Hearing scheduled for 10/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car
Monday, July 08, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 07/08 10:09 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from July 18, 2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Trial date set for 9/26/2024 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm
Thursday, April 11, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 04/11 10:01 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from June 12, 2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 16 Trial date set for 7/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Tue 03/05 1:17 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from March 14, 2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Hearing scheduled for 6/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm
Monday, January 29, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 01/29 10:29 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2/15/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/14/2024 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
Related: [-] 16 Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/30/2023. Discovery due by 9/29/2023.
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 01/29 10:31 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2/15/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/14/2024 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
Related: [-] 16 Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/30/2023. Discovery due by 9/29/2023.
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Mon 01/29 10:34 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from 2/15/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/14/2024 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car)
Related: [-] 16 Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/30/2023. Discovery due by 9/29/2023.
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 11/08 4:21 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from Nov. 16, 2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] 14 16 Trial date set for 2/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm
Sunday, July 02, 2023
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 07/03 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/02/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
16 16 order Joint Scheduling Order Fri 06/30 2:33 PM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/30/2023. Discovery due by 9/29/2023. Trial date set for 2/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 06/30 2:41 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 11/16/2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] 14 16 Trial date set for 2/15/2024 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm
Friday, March 03, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 03/04 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 03/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 03/02 10:05 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from March 9, 2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 14 Trial date set for 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
14 14 order Joint Scheduling Order Wed 03/01 2:57 PM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/1/2023. Discovery due by 6/30/2023. Trial date set for 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Fri 02/03 11:18 AM
Hearing Rescheduled from Feb. 16, 2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Hearing scheduled for 3/9/2023 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm
Thursday, January 05, 2023
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 01/05 1:20 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from Jan. 12, 2023. Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Hearing scheduled for 2/16/2023 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm
Friday, September 30, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 10/01 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 09/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
12 12 order Application (Generic) Wed 09/28 3:21 PM
Order Granting Application Re: Stipulated Agreement and Order Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/28/2022. (car)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, September 16, 2022
11 11 motion Application (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Fri 09/16 5:18 PM
Application re: Pursuant to D.N.J. LBR 9021-1(b), in Lieu of Motion in Support of Entry of (I) Stipulated Agreement and Order Under Fed. R. Evid. 502(D) and (II) Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Agreement and Order Filed by Valdo Holdings LLC, South City Prime Montvale, LLC.Objection deadline is 9/23/2022. (Hollander, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 03/11 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/10/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Fri 03/11 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/10/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
8 8 order Joint Scheduling Order Tue 03/08 2:55 PM
Joint Scheduling Order. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/8/2022. Discovery due by 8/10/2022. Trial date set for 1/12/2023 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (rah)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Notice General Tue 03/08 2:47 PM
General Notice. Event docketed: to Re-Generate Notice to the Parties. Related [+]. (rah)
Related: [-] 6 Mediation Order. Jay L. Lubetkin added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/8/2022. (rah)
6 6 order Mediation Order Tue 03/08 2:45 PM
Mediation Order. Jay L. Lubetkin added to the case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/8/2022. (rah)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 02/12 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/11/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
court Hearing Held Mon 02/14 4:11 PM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Joint Scheduling Order; Joint Mediation Order To be submitted Related [+] (car)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
4 4 order Recusal Wed 02/09 12:48 PM
Order of Recusal. Involvement of Honorable Vincent F. PapaliaTerminated. Honorable Rosemary Gambardella added. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/9/2022 (jf)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 02/09 2:26 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Rescheduled for judge re-assignment purposes only. Date and time to remain as originally scheduled Related [+] Pre-Trial hearing to be held by Judge Gambardella on 02/10/2022 at 10:00 AM by Telephone. (jf)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/05 11:53 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by John W. Sywilok on behalf of Anthony J. Feorenzo Jr.. (Sywilok, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Fri 12/10 3:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-01499 VFP] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A43278779, fee amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 12/07 9:20 AM
Summons Issued to Valley National Bank for Service on Anthony J. Feorenzo Jr. Answer due on 1/6/2022 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 2/10/2022 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (sjp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 06, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/06 5:44 PM
Adversary case 21-01499 Complaint by Valley National Bank against Anthony J. Feorenzo Jr.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Mayland, David)
Related: [-]