Arizona District Court
Judge:Diane J Humetewa
Case #: 2:21-cv-02082
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2021
Terminated:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jun 06, 2022 1:35 AM MST
Defendant
Advantage Plus Credit Reporting Incorporated
Represented By
Myles Patrick Hassett
Hassett Glasser PC
contact info
David Robert Seidman
Hassett Glasser PC
contact info
Christi A Lawson
Foley & Lardner Llp - Orlando, Fl
contact info
Jamie Alexander Glasser
Hassett Glasser PC
contact info
Leon Benjamin Silver
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
John J Atallah
Foley & Lardner Llp - Los Angeles, Ca - Flower St.
contact info
Mary Margaret Curtin
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Cecil C Garrett
Represented By
E Michelle Drake
Berger & Montague Pc - Minneapolis, Mn
contact info
Mark Luther Heaney
Heaney Law Firm LLC
contact info
Joseph C Hashmall
Berger & Montague Pc - Minneapolis, Mn
contact info

GPO Aug 31 2023
ORDER: The Lawsuit is preliminarily certified, for settlement purposes only, as a class action on behalf of the following class of plaintiffs (hereinafter referred to as the "Class Members") with respect to the claims asserted in the Lawsuit. The Court appoints as Class Representative: Plaintiff Cecil C. Garrett. The Court appoints as Class Counsel: E. Michelle Drake and Joseph C. Hashmall, Berger Montague PC. The Court will conduct an in-person Final Approval Hearing on January 17, 2024, at 10:00 AM at the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, Suite 625, 401 West Washington Street, SPC 81, Phoenix, AZ 85003-2158. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Cecil C. Garrett's "Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement" 65 is GRANTED as stated herein. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/30/23. (REK)
GPO Sep 06 2023
AMENDED ORDER - The Lawsuit is preliminarily certified, for settlement purposes only, as a class action on behalf of the following class of plaintiffs with respect to the claims asserted in the Lawsuit. The Court appoints: Class Representative Plaintiff Cecil C. Garrett; Class Counsel E. Michelle Drake and Joseph C. Hashmall; and Settlement Administrators E. Michelle Drake and Joseph C. Hashmall. The Court preliminarily approves the Settlement Agreement & Release (Doc. 65-1) as sufficiently fair, reasonable, and adequate to allow the dissemination of notice of the proposed settlement to the members of the Settlement Class. In-Court Final Approval Hearing set for 1/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Plaintiff Cecil C. Garretts Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement" (Doc. 65) is granted as stated herein. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/5/23. (DXD)
GPO Apr 12 2024
ORDER - Plaintiff Cecil C. Garrett's Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Doc. 74) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as stated herein. The Parties and Class Counsel are directed to implement this Order and the Settlement Agreement & Release in accordance with the terms this Order and the Agreement. Plaintiff Cecil C. Garrett's Motion for Attorney Fees (Doc. 71) is GRANTED in the amount of $99,000.00 for attorneys' fees and costs. No other attorneys' fees will be sought and awarded other than those agreed to in the Settlement Agreement & Release. The Clerk shall enter judgment according to the terms of this Order and terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/11/24. (DXD)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, August 05, 2024
79 79 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 08/05 11:54 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:78 Clerks Judgment, by Advantage Plus Credit Reporting Incorporated. (O'Daniel, David)
Related: [-]