New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Steven Tiscione
Case #: 2:21-cv-06831
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 07, 2022 4:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Village of Hempstead
Represented By
William J Garry
Harris Beach Pplc
contact info
Defendant
Village of Hempstead Police Dept.
Represented By
William J Garry
Harris Beach Pplc
contact info
Defendant
Keith Connors
Represented By
William J Garry
Harris Beach Pplc
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Hempstead Police Officer
Defendant
John Doe Police Officers 1-5
Defendant
John Martini
Represented By
William J Garry
Harris Beach Pplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Kashawn Watts Bryant
Represented By
Frederick K. Brewington
The Law Offices Of Frederick K. Brewington
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 29, 2024
47 47 misc Letter Mon 04/29 5:52 PM
Letter Notice of Withdrawal of Leah E. Jackson, Esq. by Kashawn Watts Bryant (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 04/29 7:27 PM
Attorney Leah Elizabeth Jackson terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/29/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
46 46 misc Transcript Tue 02/20 3:33 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 4, 2024, before Judge Gary R. Brown. Transcriber Fiore Reporting and Transcription Service, Inc., Telephone number 203-732-6461. Email address: cmfiore@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/12/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
45 45 answer Answer to Crossclaim Thu 12/07 2:50 PM
ANSWER to40 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, by Blazevich, Falanga(all sued herein individually and in their official capacities), Rossi, Village of Malverne. (Pitcoff, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
44 44 minutes Pre Motion Conference Thu 12/07 2:40 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gary R. Brown: Pre Motion Conference, DE38 held on 12/7/2023. APPEARANCES: Plaintiff: Frederick Brewington; Defendant: William Garry, Kenneth Picoff and Sheharyar Ali. Counsel for all sides present. Pre-motion conference held. Motion argued. The Court deems the motion made. Other: Rulings placed on the record. SEE ATTACHED. (FTR Log #4:11-4:40.) (JC)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
43 43 misc Letter Mon 12/04 5:03 PM
Letter by Kashawn Watts Bryant (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
42 42 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/04 9:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sheharyar Ali, I on behalf of County of Nassau, Dezelic, Ekstrom, Goldman, Martin Helmke, Londono, Malone, Mitchell, Nassau County Police Department, Piscitelli, Rogers, Timothy Slevin (aty to be noticed) (Ali, Sheharyar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
41 41 2 pgs misc Letter Thu 09/14 10:01 AM
Letter in opposition to the Malverne Defendant 's letter requesting the Court allow them to move to dismiss the Malverne Police Dept., as a Defendant. by Kashawn Watts Bryant (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
40 40 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Crossclaim Tue 08/15 3:35 PM
Second Amended ANSWER to37 Amended Complaint Second , Amended CROSSCLAIM Second against Blazevich, County of Nassau, Dezelic, Ekstrom, Falanga, Goldman, Martin Helmke, Londono, Malone, Malverne Police Department, Mitchell, Nassau County Police Department, Piscitelli, Rogers, Rossi, Timothy Slevin, Village of Malverne by Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept., John Martini, Keith Connors. (Garry, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
39 39 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Crossclaim Mon 08/14 11:32 AM
ANSWER to37 Amended Complaint Second , Second CROSSCLAIM against Blazevich, Keith Connors, Falanga, Malverne Police Department, John Martini, Rossi, Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept., Village of Malverne by Dezelic, Londono, Rogers, Malone, Timothy Slevin, Martin Helmke, Mitchell, Goldman, Piscitelli, County of Nassau, Nassau County Police Department, Ekstrom. (Mahon, Mary)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Mon 08/14 11:42 AM
ORDER granting38 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A pre-motion telephone conference is scheduled for December 4, 2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Gary R. Brown, at which time the parties should be prepared to address Defendants' anticipated motion pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, DE 38. The parties are to call (888) 363-4734 using ACCESS CODE 4132441 five minutes prior to the designated time.The parties are on notice that in appropriate cases, the pre-motion letter and the response, along with the parties' arguments made at the pre-motion conference, may be construed at the discretion of the Court as the motion itself. Arguments not raised in the pre-motion letters or during the pre-motion conference shall be deemed waived. See In re Best Payphones, Inc., 450 F. App'x 8, 15 (2d Cir. 2011). At the conference, the Court will issue a briefing schedule if necessary. Plaintiff is directed to respond to DE 38 in accordance with the undersigned's individual rules by September 14, 2023. Before requesting an adjournment, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter with several proposed dates. The parties and other attendees to the conference are also reminded that the recording of any proceeding of the Court, including this conference, is prohibited under Local Rule 1.8. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/14/2023. (MR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
38 38 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 08/10 3:18 PM
Second MOTION for pre motion conference re: proposed motion to dismiss by Blazevich, Falanga, Malverne Police Department, Rossi, Village of Malverne. (Soller, Cristina)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
37 37 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/31 12:28 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Kashawn Watts Bryant. (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
36 36 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Wed 07/26 4:49 PM
Minute Order for Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2023 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Manuel for Plaintiff; Garry, Mahon, Soller for Defendants. Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint35 is granted. Plaintiffshall file the Amended Complaint by July 31, 2023. If Defendants intend to file a motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint, they shall file a pre-motion conference letter by August 11, 2023. (FTR Log #AT&T (1:36 - 1:40).) (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/25 11:13 AM
ORDER deferring ruling on35 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend35 . A motion hearing will be held at 1:15 p.m. on July 26, 2023 before the undersigned by phone. The parties shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/25/2023. (LV)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
35 35 1 pgs misc Status Report Mon 07/24 4:39 PM
STATUS REPORT by Kashawn Watts Bryant (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
order Status Report Order Tue 07/18 12:33 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: During the last conference held on April 24, 2023, plaintiff was direct to amending the complaint and the parties were to submit a proposed discovery schedule for the Court's approval within seven days after the Amended Complaint is filed. To date, there has been no amended complaint filed and no further correspondence with the Court by either party. Accordingly, counsel shall electronically file a joint status report due by 7/25/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/18/2023. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
34 34 minutes Telephone Conference Tue 04/25 8:41 AM
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 4/24/2023 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Brewington for Plaintiff; Mahon, Soller, Garry for Defendants. Plaintiff will be amending the complaint as discussed during the pre-motion conference. Parties shall submit a proposed discovery schedule for the Court's approval within seven days after the Amended Complaint is filed. (Not Recorded.) (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
33 33 misc Letter Fri 04/07 4:47 PM
Letter in Opposition to Defendants' Pre-Motion Letters by Kashawn Watts Bryant (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Letter Fri 04/07 2:24 PM
Letter Response to DE29 by County of Nassau (Mahon, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
order Order(Other) Thu 04/06 4:12 PM
ORDER. Review of the record herein reveals that plaintiff, Village of Hempstead, County of Nassau, and individual defendants have failed to respond to DE 29 by March 17, 2023, as required by this Court's individual rules and Docket Order, dated 3/2/2023. Assuming such parties intend to respond to DE 29, they are ordered to respond by close of business April 7, 2023. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/6/2023. (JP) Modified on 4/6/2023 to edit text per GRB chambers(JC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
31 31 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/15 1:04 PM
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 3/14/2023 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Brewington for Plaintiff; Garry, Soller for Defendants. In light of the upcoming pre-motion conference on Defendants' proposed motion to dismiss, the parties have not yet discussed a discovery schedule for the new defendants on Plaintiff's most recent amended complaint. At the parties' request, the Court will hold a further telephone conference following the pre- motion conference. A telephone conference will be held on April 24, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. (Not Recorded.) (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 03/02 11:08 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A pre-motion telephone conference is scheduled for April 11, 2023 at 2:00 PM before Judge Gary R. Brown, at which time the parties should be prepared to address the Malverne Defendants' anticipated motion pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, DE 29. The parties are to call (888) 363-4734 using ACCESS CODE 4132441 five minutes prior to the designated time. The parties are on notice that in appropriate cases, the pre-motion letter and the response, along with the parties' arguments made at the pre-motion conference, may be construed at the discretion of the Court as the motion itself. Arguments not raised in the pre-motion letters or during the pre-motion conference shall be deemed waived. See In re Best Payphones, Inc. , 450 F. App'x 8, 15 (2d Cir. 2011). At the conference, the Court will issue a briefing schedule if necessary. Plaintiff is directed to respond to DE 29 in accordance with the undersigned's individual rules by March 17, 2023. Before requesting an adjournment, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter with several proposed dates. The parties and other attendees to the conference are also reminded that the recording of any proceeding of the Court, including this conference, is prohibited under Local Rule 1.8. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 3/2/2023. c/ecf (JT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
30 30 minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/01 3:11 PM
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 2/27/2023 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Brewington for Plaintiff; Garry for Defendants. Newly served defendants have entered notices of appearance but did not appear for the telephone conference. Accordingly, the telephone conference is adjourned to March 14, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. Parties are to use the same dial-in information used for today's conference. Parties should confer before the conference and be prepared to discuss a revised discovery schedule. (Not Recorded.) (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
29 29 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 02/24 5:04 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference by Blazevich, Falanga, Rossi, Village of Malverne. (Pitcoff, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/24 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth E. Pitcoff on behalf of Blazevich, Ekstrom, Malverne Police Department, Rossi (aty to be noticed) (Pitcoff, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 02/03 5:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kashawn Watts Bryant. Blazevich served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/27/2023; County of Nassau served on 1/19/2023, answer due 2/9/2023; Dezelic served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Ekstrom served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Falanga served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/27/2023; Goldman served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Martin Helmke served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Londono served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Malone served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Malverne Police Department served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/27/2023; Mitchell served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Nassau County Police Department served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Piscitelli served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Rogers served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Rossi served on 1/20/2023, answer due 2/27/2023; Timothy Slevin served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023; Village of Malverne served on 1/23/2022, answer due 2/27/2023. (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Nassau County Police Department,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service Det. Martin Helmke,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service Det. Goldman,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service Det. Rogers,
Att: 5 Affidavit of Service Det. Dezelic,
Att: 6 Affidavit of Service P.O. Timothy Slevin,
Att: 7 Affidavit of Service Det. Mitchell,
Att: 8 Affidavit of Service Det. Piscitelli,
Att: 9 Affidavit of Service Det. Ekstrom,
Att: 10 Affidavit of Service Det. Malone,
Att: 11 Affidavit of Service Det. Londono,
Att: 12 Affidavit of Service Village of Malverne,
Att: 13 Affidavit of Service Malverne Police Department,
Att: 14 Affidavit of Service P.O. Rossi,
Att: 15 Affidavit of Service P.O. Falanga,
Att: 16 Affidavit of Service P.O. Blazevich
26 26 answer Answer to Crossclaim Fri 02/03 12:56 PM
ANSWER to24 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Crossclaim, , CROSSCLAIM against Blazevich, Keith Connors, Falanga, Malverne Police Department, John Martini, Rossi, Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept., Village of Malverne by Goldman, Dezelic, Londono, Piscitelli, Rogers, Malone, County of Nassau, Timothy Slevin, Martin Helmke, Nassau County Police Department, Mitchell, Ekstrom. (Mahon, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 01/27 2:57 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint by Blazevich, Falanga, Malverne Police Department, Rossi, Village of Malverne. (Soller, Cristina)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/27 3:23 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to complaint Blazevich answer due 2/27/2023; Falanga answer due 2/27/2023; Malverne Police Department answer due 2/27/2023; Rossi answer due 2/27/2023; Village of Malverne answer due 2/27/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/27/2023. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Crossclaim Tue 01/10 4:31 PM
Amended ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Blazevich, County of Nassau, Dezelic, John Doe Hempstead Police Officer, Ekstrom, Falanga, Goldman, Martin Helmke, Londono, Malone, Malverne Police Department, Mitchell, Nassau County Police Department, Piscitelli, Rogers, Rossi, Timothy Slevin, Village of Malverne by Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept., John Martini, Keith Connors. (Garry, William)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Summons Issued Tue 01/10 10:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Blazevich, Keith Connors, County of Nassau, Dezelic, John Doe Hempstead Police Officer, Ekstrom, Falanga, Goldman, Martin Helmke, Londono, Malone, Malverne Police Department, John Martini, Mitchell, Nassau County Police Department, Piscitelli, Rogers, Rossi, Timothy Slevin, Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept., Village of Malverne. (JC)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
22 22 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 01/09 11:57 AM
Proposed Summons. Re20 Amended Complaint, by Kashawn Watts Bryant (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
21 21 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/06 12:03 AM
Proposed Summons. Re20 Amended Complaint, by Kashawn Watts Bryant (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 01/09 9:11 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The name on the summons does not match the name as it appears on the complaint., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (JC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/29 8:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Keith Connors, John Doe Hempstead Police Officer, John Martini, Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept., County of Nassau, Nassau County Police Department, Martin Helmke, Timothy Slevin, Dezelic, Rogers, Goldman, Ekstrom, Piscitelli, Malone, Mitchell, Londono, Village of Malverne, Malverne Police Department, Rossi, Blazevich, Falanga, filed by Kashawn Watts Bryant. (JC)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Tue 01/03 11:38 AM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information: Original DE 20 (AMENDED COMPLAINT against Keith Connors, John Doe Hempstead Police Officer, John Doe Police Officers 1-5, John Martini, Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept., filed by Kashawn Watts Bryant. (Brewington, Frederick)) has been deleted. Counsel did not add additional 17 defendants as per the Amended Complaint. The Clerks Office will make all necessary corrections. (JC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 12/28 5:52 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to December 29, 2022 to File amended complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/28/2022. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 12/22 11:43 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Kashawn Watts Bryant. (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/16 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Darnell Manuel, III on behalf of Kashawn Watts Bryant (aty to be noticed) (Manuel, Albert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/08 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cobia Malik Powell on behalf of Kashawn Watts Bryant (aty to be noticed) (Powell, Cobia)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
16 16 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Order on Motion to Stay ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 11/28 10:34 AM
Minute Order for Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2022 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Brewington for Plaintiff; Garry for Defendants. The Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 1 Complaint,, MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery15 is granted. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by December 22, 2022 to add the new defendants. The Court will hold a telephone conference on February 27, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. (FTR Log #AT&T (10:02 - 10:07).) (LV)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Order on Motion to Stay Mon 11/14 1:47 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on15 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend1 Complaint, MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, ; deferring ruling on15 Motion to Stay. The application will be discussed during the conference already scheduled for November 28th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 11/14/2022. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
15 15 motion Extension of Time to Amend Stay Thu 11/10 9:34 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend1 Complaint, , MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,,,, by Kashawn Watts Bryant. (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/02 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Elizabeth Jackson on behalf of Kashawn Watts Bryant (aty to be noticed) (Jackson, Leah)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 10/28 6:25 AM
In light of the Order issued on September 16th, the settlement conference scheduled for October 31st is canceled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/28/2022. (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 09/16 3:17 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The remaining deadlines are approved as follows: Deadline for motions to join new parties or amend pleadings - 11/28/22; All fact discovery to be completed by 11/15/22; Exchange of expert reports - 12/15/22; Expert depositions completed by - 1/15/23; All discovery completed by - 2/16/23; Final date to take first step in dispositive motion practice - 3/16/23. A telephone conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on November 28, 2022 before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/16/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
13 13 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 09/15 11:52 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Kashawn Watts Bryant. (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
12 12 minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 07/26 5:23 PM
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 7/26/2022 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Brewington for Plaintiff; Garry for Defendants. Today's settlement conference will instead be held on October 31, 2022 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 910 of the Central Islip Courthouse. Parties are to submit their respective settlement positions via ex parte electronic filing no later than October 28, 2022. A motion to file ex parte is not required. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
11 11 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 07/25 4:02 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for July 26, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. by Kashawn Watts Bryant. (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 07/25 5:01 PM
ORDER denying11 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Tomorrow's in-person settlement conference will instead be held as a telephone conference to set a new date for the settlement conference. The parties shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/25/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 07/22 6:28 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The time to join new parties or amend pleadings is extended to September 28, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/22/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
10 10 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 07/21 5:24 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Join Parties and Amend Pleadings by Keith Connors, John Martini, Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept.. (Garry, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
9 9 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/16 8:35 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held on 3/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Manuel for Plaintiff; Garry for Defendants. The Court sets the following discovery deadlines:Deadline for completion of Rule 26(a) initial disclosures - 4/15/22;Completion of Phase I discovery - 5/15/22;First requests for production of documents and interrogatories due by - 6/15/22;Deadline for motions to join new parties or amend pleadings - 7/28/22;All fact discovery to be completed by 9/15/22;Exchange of expert reports - 10/15/22;Expert depositions completed by - 11/15/22;All discovery completed by - 12/16/22;Final date to take first step in dispositive motion practice - 1/16/23.An in-person settlement conference will be held on July 26, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 910 of the Central Islip Courthouse. Parties are to submit their respective settlement positions via ex parte electronic filing no later than July 23, 2022. A motion to file ex parte is not required. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
8 8 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 03/08 2:38 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Kashawn Watts Bryant (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
7 7 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/17 1:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on March 16, 2022 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 888-557-8511 with access code 3152145. The attached Discovery Plan Worksheet is to be completed by counsel and electronically filed with the Court by March 14th. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/17/2022. (Vasquez, Lea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/16 1:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Keith Connors, John Martini, Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept.. (Garry, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
order Status Report Order Wed 02/02 4:36 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: A written Status Report is due by 3/3/2022. Failure to submit a report may result in an order dismissing this case for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 2/2/2022. (McMorrow, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/12 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kashawn Watts Bryant. Keith Connors served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; John Martini served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022; Village of Hempstead served on 1/2/2022, answer due 1/23/2022; Village of Hempstead Police Dept. served on 1/2/2022, answer due 1/23/2022. (Brewington, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service Village of Hempstead Police Department,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service Det. John Martini,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service Det. Keith Connors
Friday, December 10, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 12/10 9:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Keith Connors, John Martini, Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept.. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 12/10 9:40 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 12/10 9:31 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Fri 12/10 9:08 AM
Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Added missing Defendants John Doe Hempstead Police Officer and John Doe Police Officers 1-5 to the case. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Proposed Summons) and re-entered as against all Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 12/10 9:39 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/09 5:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Keith Connors, John Doe Hempstead Police Officer, John Doe Police Officers 1-5, John Martini, Village of Hempstead, Village of Hempstead Police Dept. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Kashawn Watts Bryant. (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 12/10 9:06 AM
FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-15103799 (Flanagan, Doreen)
Related: [-]