Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:R Barclay Surrick
Case #: 2:21-cv-05414
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2021
Terminated:Jul 07, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 08, 2022 4:51 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT ST. MARY, LLC
Represented By
DANIEL GOLDBERG
The Goldberg Law Office
contact info
KALANI E. LINNELL
Raffaele Puppio
contact info
DAVID L. BRAVERMAN
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
THE IVY AT DEER LODGE, LLC
Represented By
DANIEL GOLDBERG
The Goldberg Law Office
contact info
KALANI E. LINNELL
Raffaele Puppio
contact info
DAVID L. BRAVERMAN
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
THE IVY AT GREAT FALLS, LLC
Represented By
DANIEL GOLDBERG
The Goldberg Law Office
contact info
KALANI E. LINNELL
Raffaele Puppio
contact info
DAVID L. BRAVERMAN
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
JOHN C. KILGANNON
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Counter Defendant
HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By
JOHN C. KILGANNON
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Defendant
ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT ST. MARY, LLC
Represented By
DANIEL GOLDBERG
The Goldberg Law Office
contact info
KALANI E. LINNELL
Raffaele Puppio
contact info
DAVID L. BRAVERMAN
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
Defendant
THE IVY AT DEER LODGE, LLC
Represented By
DANIEL GOLDBERG
The Goldberg Law Office
contact info
KALANI E. LINNELL
Raffaele Puppio
contact info
DAVID L. BRAVERMAN
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
Defendant
THE IVY AT GREAT FALLS, LLC
Represented By
DANIEL GOLDBERG
The Goldberg Law Office
contact info
KALANI E. LINNELL
Raffaele Puppio
contact info
DAVID L. BRAVERMAN
Braverman Kaskey PC
contact info
Plaintiff
HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC
3220 Tillman Drive Suite 300
Bensalem, PA 19020
Represented By
JOHN C. KILGANNON
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Plaintiff
HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
3220 Tillman Drive Suite 300
Bensalem, PA 19020
Represented By
JOHN C. KILGANNON
Stevens & Lee
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, July 07, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Thu 07/07 10:56 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION HAS BEEN SETTLED AND UPON ORDER OF THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE PROVISIONS OF RULE 41.1(B) OF THE LOCAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE OF THIS COURT, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/7/22. 7/7/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 07/07 10:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY Settlement Status Telephone Conference held on 7/7/22. (bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 06/30 8:57 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/1/2022 05:00 PM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 6/30/22. 6/30/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
21 21 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 06/30 8:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY Settlement Video Conference held on 6/29/22. (bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 06/09 3:11 PM
ORDER THAT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, JUNE 15, 2022, AT 9:30AM HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 6/29/2022 01:30 PM IN Judge's Chambers ROOM 3038, BEFORE HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 6//9/22. 6/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 06/10 11:56 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 06/06 1:19 PM
ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS REASSIGNED FOR SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE MARILYN HEFFLEY TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE ELIZABETH T. HEY. THIS ORDER DOES NOT VACATE ANY PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED CONFERENCE. COUNSEL SHALL CONTACT THE CHAMBERS OF THE ASSIGNED JUDGE FOR INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING ANY PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 6/6/22. 6/6/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
18 18 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/13 3:32 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET IS RESCHEDULED FOR 6/15/2022 09:30 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 5/13/22. 5/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 03/09 11:35 AM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/16/2022 09:30 AM IN Via Telephone Conference BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY; AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY ON 3/9/22. 3/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
16 16 order Scheduling Order Mon 02/28 2:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARILYN HEFFLEY WILL BE SCHEDULED UPON THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL. ALL DISCOVERY, EXPERT AND OTHERWISE, SHALL BE COMPLETED NO LATER THAN 7/11/22. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 8/11/22. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/10/22, AT 12:00 PM IN CHAMBERS. TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/22, AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8-A, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/28/22. 2/28/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
15 15 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 02/25 10:07 AM
ANSWER to11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, of Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs by HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC, HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC..(KILGANNON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 24, 2022
14 14 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 02/24 4:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK Pretrial / Rule 16 Conference held on 2/24/22 (bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
13 13 misc Status Report Fri 02/18 6:04 PM
STATUS REPORT filed Jointly by ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT ST. MARY, LLC, THE IVY AT DEER LODGE, LLC, THE IVY AT GREAT FALLS, LLC. (BRAVERMAN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 02/16 2:56 PM
ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 2/24/2022, AT 4:00 PM VIA TELEPHONE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/16/22. 2/16/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 02/14 5:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims , COUNTERCLAIM against HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC, HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. by THE IVY AT GREAT FALLS, LLC, THE IVY AT DEER LODGE, LLC, ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT ST. MARY, LLC.(BRAVERMAN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 02/08 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KALANI E. LINNELL on behalf of ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT ST. MARY, LLC, THE IVY AT DEER LODGE, LLC, THE IVY AT GREAT FALLS, LLC(LINNELL, KALANI)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 02/04 10:28 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER THROUGH AND INCLUDING 2/14/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 2/4/22. 2/4/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 01/13 4:55 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FILED ON BEHALF OF DANIEL GOLDBERG, ESQUIRE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF DANIEL GOLDBERG, EQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) SHALL BE AND HEREBY IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 1/13/22.1/13/22 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(ti) Modified on 1/13/2022 (ti)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 01/12 6:00 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Goldberg, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15659406.) filed by ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT ST. MARY, LLC, THE IVY AT DEER LODGE, LLC, THE IVY AT GREAT FALLS, LLC..(BRAVERMAN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Application,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/12 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KALANI E. LINNELL on behalf of ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT ST. MARY, LLC, THE IVY AT DEER LODGE, LLC, THE IVY AT GREAT FALLS, LLC with Certificate of Service(LINNELL, KALANI)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
5 5 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 01/10 12:07 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER THROUGH AND INCLUDING 2/5/2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 1/10/22. 1/10/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/06 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID L. BRAVERMAN on behalf of ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT ST. MARY, LLC, THE IVY AT DEER LODGE, LLC, THE IVY AT GREAT FALLS, LLC with Certificate of Service(BRAVERMAN, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/05 10:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC re: Bryan Lane, Burris Process Serving LLC served Summons and Complaint upon All Defendants by hand delivery. All Defendants.(KILGANNON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
Monday, December 13, 2021
service Summons Issued Mon 12/13 4:04 PM
Summons Issued as to ACCORDIUS HEALTH AT ST. MARY, LLC, THE IVY AT DEER LODGE, LLC, THE IVY AT GREAT FALLS, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/13/21 (bw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
2 2 misc Statement Fri 12/10 2:35 PM
Statement - corporate disclosure per Rule 7.1 by HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC, HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (KILGANNON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 12/10 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15602768.), filed by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC.(KILGANNON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C,
Att: 7 Exhibit D,
Att: 8 Exhibit E,
Att: 9 Exhibit F,
Att: 10 Exhibit G