Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert H Cleland
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 3:21-cv-12889
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Dec 09, 2021
Terminated:Jun 08, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 07, 2022 4:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Jason Bryan
Represented By
James J. Boutrous, II
Mcdonald Hopkins
contact info
Mark William Steiner
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info
Defendant
JCB Design & Build, LLC
Represented By
James J. Boutrous, II
Mcdonald Hopkins
contact info
Mark William Steiner
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Superior Scape, Inc.
Represented By
Linda M. Watson
Clark Hill
contact info

GPO Dec 10 2021
ORDER DENYING IN PART 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTEEmergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EX PARTEEmergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause EX PARTE filed by Superior Scape, Inc. DIRECTING Plaintiff to effectuate service of the complaint and motion by 12/13/2021 and DIRECTING Defendants to show cause by 12/20/2021 why the court should not enter a preliminary injunction against them. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
GPO Jan 03 2022
OPINION AND ORDER denying denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and DIRECTING parties to confer and file a joint discovery plan addressing all relevant deadlines by 1/17/2022 . Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
23 23 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Wed 06/08 11:41 AM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
22 22 trial Witness List Fri 04/29 4:24 PM
FINAL WITNESS LIST by Superior Scape, Inc. (Watson, Linda)
Related: [-]
21 21 trial Witness List Fri 04/29 3:12 PM
WITNESS LIST by All Defendants (Boutrous, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
20 20 trial Witness List Fri 02/04 12:49 PM
Preliminary WITNESS LIST by All Defendants (Boutrous, James)
Related: [-]
19 19 trial Witness List Fri 02/04 11:39 AM
Preliminary WITNESS LIST by Superior Scape, Inc. (Watson, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/25 2:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/27/2022 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 7/29/2022 Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2022 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland Jury Trial set for 11/14/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. Related [+] (LWag)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
17 17 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Tue 01/18 12:18 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Watson, Linda)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
16 16 16 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Show Cause Mon 01/03 3:20 PM
OPINION AND ORDER denying denying2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and DIRECTING parties to confer and file a joint discovery plan addressing all relevant deadlines by 1/17/2022 . Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Related: [-]
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/03 2:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Jason Bryan. (Boutrous, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/03 2:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by JCB Design & Build, LLC. (Boutrous, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 12/22 5:34 PM
REPLY to Response re2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EX PARTE Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause EX PARTE Plaintiff's Reply Brief to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction filed by Superior Scape, Inc.. (Watson, Linda)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
12 12 notice Appearance Mon 12/20 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark William Steiner on behalf of All Defendants. (Steiner, Mark)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 12/20 2:16 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by JCB Design & Build, LLC (Boutrous, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/20 2:14 PM
RESPONSE to2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EX PARTE Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause EX PARTE Defendants, JCB Design & Build, LLC and Jason Bryan's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction and Certificate of Service filed by All Defendants. (Boutrous, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1. May 18, 2021 Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2. December 17, 2021 Declaration of Jason Bryan,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3. December 17, 2021 Declaration of Antonio Gonzalez,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4. December 17, 2021 Declaration of Alfredo Alejandro Mora Curiel,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5. May 19, 2021 Affidavit of Jason Bryan
9 9 notice Appearance Mon 12/20 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Boutrous, II on behalf of All Defendants. (Boutrous, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
8 8 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/13 1:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jason Bryan served on 12/11/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Watson, Linda)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/13 1:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. JCB Design & Build, LLC served on 12/11/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Watson, Linda)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued* Mon 12/13 10:54 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *JCB Design & Build, LLC* (KBro)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued* Mon 12/13 10:54 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Jason Bryan* (KBro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 12/13 10:53 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (KBro)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
4 4 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/10 5:38 PM
ORDER DENYING IN PART2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EX PARTE Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause EX PARTE filed by Superior Scape, Inc. DIRECTING Plaintiff to effectuate service of the complaint and motion by 12/13/2021 and DIRECTING Defendants to show cause by 12/20/2021 why the court should not enter a preliminary injunction against them. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Reassignment/Disqualification Fri 12/10 4:18 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg and Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr in Detroit to District Judge Robert H. Cleland and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman in Port Huron. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
2 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order EX PARTE , Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction EX PARTE , Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause EX PARTE by All Plaintiffs. (Watson, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed TRO,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - RGIS v Gerdes,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Ford v Launch Tech,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - AK Steel v Colton,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Red D Freight v Sexton
1 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED filed by Superior Scape, Inc. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8718192 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): USDC ED Michigan, 21-cv-10965, Judge Robert H. Cleland ] (Watson, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Former lawsuit,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Prior Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Santana,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Coronel,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Loreto,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Ltr- Boutrrous with photos,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - July 16 email,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - August 30 2021 email