Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:21-mj-04308
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2021
Terminated:Dec 08, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Dec 11, 2021 2:39 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Noticing AUSA CR TP/SR
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kris Bortnovsky (1)
Terminated: 12/08/2021
Represented By
Brian Todd Pakett
Law Offices Of Brian T. Pakett, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Shapiro (2)
Terminated: 12/08/2021
Represented By
Jared Weintal Whaley
Coffey Burlington, P.L.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/11/2021 3:16 AM EST
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
Arrest of Kris Bortnovsky (at)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Ryan Shapiro (at)
Related: [-]
1 1 Magistrate Removal of Complaint from District of Massachusetts Case number in the other District 21-mj-2826-MBB as to Kris Bortnovsky (1), Ryan Shapiro (2). (kss)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Proceedings as to Kris Bortnovsky held on 12/8/2021. Bond recommendation/set: Kris Bortnovsky (1) $500,000 PSB. Defendant released. Defendant waives removal and is ordered to appear in the D/MA on 12/17/21 at 11:00 AM. Attorney added: Brian Todd Pakett for Kris Bortnovsky (Digital 14:13:29/15:23:07) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 12/8/2021). (at)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian Todd Pakett appearing for Kris Bortnovsky (at)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER OF RULE 5 & 5.1 REMOVAL/IDENTITY HEARINGS by Kris Bortnovsky (at)
Related: [-]
5 5 $500,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Kris Bortnovsky Approved by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (at) (at).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (12/9/2021) Restricted Bond with 7th Page
6 6 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jared Weintal Whaley appearing for Ryan Shapiro (at)
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Proceedings as to Ryan Shapiro held on 12/8/2021. Bond recommendation/set: Ryan Shapiro (2) $500,000 PSB. Defendant released. Defendant waives removal and is ordered to appear in the D/MA on 12/17/21 at 11:00 AM. Attorney added: Jared Weintal Whaley for Ryan Shapiro (Digital 14:13:29/15:31:38) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 12/8/2021). (at)
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER OF RULE 5 & 5.1 REMOVAL/IDENTITY HEARINGS by Ryan Shapiro (at)
Related: [-]
9 9 $500,000 PSB Bond Entered as to Ryan Shapiro Approved by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Please see bond image for conditions of release. (at)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF REMOVAL ISSUED to the District of Massachusetts as to Ryan Shapiro. Closing Case for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 12/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (cg1)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF REMOVAL ISSUED to the District of Massachusetts as to Kris Bortnovsky. Closing Case for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 12/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (cg1)
Related: [-]