Cohen et al v. Hansen et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | Peggy A Leen |
Case #: | 2:12-cv-01401 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2012 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 11, 2016 6:16 PM PDT |
Defendant
Steven Earl Firebaugh
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ross B. Hansen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Northwest Territorial Mint, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Stephen Cohen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cohen Asset Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Steven Merrill Finch
Terminated: 03/04/2013
|
1. | One Man's Bid to Clear His Name Online: 4 Years, $3 Million and Some Dead Turtles (wsj.com) |
Submitted Sat 02/25/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |