Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Brantley Starr
Case #: 3:21-cv-03101
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2021
Re-opened:Aug 07, 2024
Terminated:Aug 16, 2022
Case in other court:68th Judicial District Court of Dallas County, TX, DC-21-17101
Last checked: Saturday Jun 11, 2022 4:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Optum Inc
Represented By
Nicole Helene Munoz Huschka
Figari + Davenport LLP
contact info
Andrew G Jubinsky
Figari & Davenport LLP
contact info
Lance V Clack
Figari & Davenport
contact info
Nicole Helene Munoz
Figari + Davenport LLP
contact info
Defendant
United HealthCare Services Inc
Represented By
Nicole Helene Munoz Huschka
Figari + Davenport LLP
contact info
Andrew G Jubinsky
Figari & Davenport LLP
contact info
Lance V Clack
Figari & Davenport
contact info
Nicole Helene Munoz
Figari + Davenport LLP
contact info
Defendant
UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas LLC
Represented By
Nicole Helene Munoz Huschka
Figari + Davenport LLP
contact info
Andrew G Jubinsky
Figari & Davenport LLP
contact info
Lance V Clack
Figari & Davenport
contact info
Nicole Helene Munoz
Figari + Davenport LLP
contact info
Defendant
UnitedHealthcare Inc
Represented By
Nicole Helene Munoz Huschka
Figari + Davenport LLP
contact info
Andrew G Jubinsky
Figari & Davenport LLP
contact info
Lance V Clack
Figari & Davenport
contact info
Nicole Helene Munoz
Figari + Davenport LLP
contact info
Defendant
Unitedhealthcare Benefits of Texas Inc
Represented By
Nicole Helene Munoz Huschka
Figari + Davenport LLP
contact info
Andrew G Jubinsky
Figari & Davenport LLP
contact info
Lance V Clack
Figari & Davenport
contact info
Nicole Helene Munoz
Figari + Davenport LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Caris MPI Inc
Represented By
Daniel Lee Tobey
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Whitney Cloud
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Meagan Dyer Self
Dla Piper Us LLP
contact info
Breanna E Fields
Dla Piper LLP
contact info

GPO May 29 2023
) (axm)MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 43 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The Court will allow Caris to file an amended motion to seal within 28 days of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 5/29/2023
GPO Jul 26 2023
Court FINDS AS MOOT United's 15 motion to dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 7/26/2023) (twd)MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES Caris's 9 remand motion. But because Caris failed to exhaust its administrative remedies, the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Caris's claims against United. In light of that dismissal, the

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
102 102 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 05/02 1:57 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Optum Inc, United Healthcare Services Inc, UnitedHealthcare Benefits of Texas Inc, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas LLC, UnitedHealthcare Inc re101 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended "Petition" (Clack, Lance)
Related: [-]
101 101 motion Dismiss Fri 05/02 1:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended "Petition" filed by Optum Inc, United Healthcare Services Inc, UnitedHealthcare Benefits of Texas Inc, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas LLC, UnitedHealthcare Inc (Clack, Lance)
Related: [-]