Original Case: 1:21-cv-10522

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-civil-01996
Typecivil / private / contract
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2021
Terminated:Mar 21, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Mar 26, 2022 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT SMITH
Represented By
Brian J. O'Donnell
Northeast Justice Center
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHELMSFORD GROUP, LLC
Represented By
Michael Robert Brown
Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC
contact info
Kaitlin K. Smith
Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC
contact info
Joseph Aviv
Honigman LLP
contact info
Shannon C. Duggan
Honigman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NEWBURY MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Represented By
Michael Robert Brown
Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC
contact info
Kaitlin K. Smith
Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC
contact info
Joseph Aviv
Honigman LLP
contact info
Shannon C. Duggan
Honigman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/26/2022 4:28 AM EDT
Monday, December 13, 2021
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #21) filed by Appellants Chelmsford Group, LLC and Newbury Management Company. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 12/27/2021. 21-1996 (JMK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF