Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03124
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2021
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shannon Foster Estridge
33 Grove Hall Lane
Columbia, SC 29212
Represented By
Shannon Foster Estridge
contact info
Defendant
Carl Estridge
33 Grove Hall Lane
Columbia, SC 29212
Represented By
Carl Estridge
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Berlauk Falabella
Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp
contact info
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
13 13 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 09/17 11:59 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 09/13 1:59 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, August 15, 2022
11 11 misc Statement Mon 08/15 10:37 AM
Statement (Mediator's Report) filed by Christian K. Vogel of Vogel & Cromwell, LLC on behalf of Christian K. Vogel. (Vogel, Christian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
10 10 court Hearing held; pleading withdrawn in open court Thu 04/14 1:51 PM
Hearing held; Motion withdrawn in open court; Appearance(s): David Swan for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee; Carl Estridge Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, April 13, 2022
9 9 answer Objection Thu 04/14 7:53 AM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Carl Estridge, Shannon Foster Estridge. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, April 04, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Mon 04/04 2:32 PM
Amended Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing (Amended to Correct Caption) Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,6 Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,7 Notice of Deficient Filing Issued
7 7 court Deficient Filing Notice Request Mon 04/04 2:14 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to Robert Westermann regarding Caption, Official Forms: [See LBR 5005-1(C)(2)] Every paper must bear the debtor(s) name, the case number and chapter of the case to which it pertains and be in substantial compliance with the current Official Form. Related [+] Document(s) due by 4/18/2022. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, March 31, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Thu 03/31 4:54 PM
Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
5 5 motion Default Judgment Thu 03/31 4:50 PM
Motion for Default Judgment and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY,4 Certificate of Service filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/14 3:32 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 12/14 3:05 PM
Summons and notice issued to Carl Estridge ; Shannon Foster Estridge Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, December 13, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 12/13 1:57 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03124 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 34046462, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 12/13 1:56 PM
Adversary case 21-03124 Complaint against Shannon Foster Estridge, Carl Estridge filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]