Consolidated
Lead case: 0:15-md-02642

Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Case #: 0:21-cv-02665
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2021
Terminated:Aug 23, 2024
Case in other court:California Northern, 4:21-cv-06243
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2022 4:59 AM CDT
Defendant
Bayer AG
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
a Corporation O MegaBldg
Pittsburgh, PA 15205
Represented By
Sharon D. Mayo
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
Represented By
Sharon D. Mayo
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Sharon D. Mayo
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By
James Francis Murdica
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Noushan Noureddini
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Janssen Reseach & Development, LLC
Represented By
James Francis Murdica
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Noushan Noureddini
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
a Corporation One Johnson & Johnson Plaza
New Brunswick, NJ 08933
Represented By
James Francis Murdica
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Noushan Noureddini
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, LLC
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff
Eric McKinley
Represented By
Nancy Hersh
Hersh & Hersh
contact info
Kate Hersh-Boyle
Hersh & Hersh
contact info
Jody L Winter
Lloyd Winter, P.C.
contact info
Nancy L Hersh
Hersh And Hersh
contact info

GPO Dec 14 2021
[Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]MDL TRANSFER ORDER: Case number 4:21-cv-06243-SBA is transferred to the District of Minnesota and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John R. Tunheim to become part of MDL 2642. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, August 23, 2024
33 33 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 08/23 2:56 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER DISMISSING CASE re30 Stipulation of Dismissal,31 Stipulation of Dismissal. Pursuant to the parties' Stipulations of Dismissal with Prejudice filed on August 7, 2024 (ECF No. 30) and August 22, 2024 (ECF No. 31), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice and on the merits and without costs, disbursements, or attorneys' fees to any party. Ordered by Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/23/2024. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
32 32 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Thu 08/22 2:30 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re31 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Leskin, Lori)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/22 2:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Jointly Signed by Eric McKinley. (Leskin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/07 1:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Reseach & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Eric McKinley. (Richer, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
29 29 order Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail Mon 07/29 12:22 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER in Response to Joint Update Letter Emailed to Chambers: In view of the joint update letter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint update letter on the status of finalizing the settlement on or before August 28, 2024 , if they have not filed a stipulation of dismissal by that date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 7/29/2024.(LNP)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
28 28 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 06/18 9:37 AM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 6/17/2024: Settlement Conference - Settlement Reached. Digital Recording Minneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom Video Conference Time: 9:00 AM - 5:47 PM Total Time: 8 Hours & 47 Minutes SEALED Time: 5:47 - 5:52 PM Total SEALED Time: 5 Minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff: Jody L. Winter, Nancy L. Hersh Eric McKinley - Plaintiff For Defendants Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Corporation: Lori B. Leskin Amanda Camelotto - Corporate Counsel, Litigation at Bayer PROCEEDINGS: The parties are ordered to either finalize the settlement and submit a stipulation for dismissal within 45 days or send a joint letter to the Court explaining how much more time is required and the reason why. If requested, the transcript or portions of the transcript should be filed under SEAL and restricted to the parties and their counsel. (LNP)
Related: [-]
27 27 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 06/18 9:29 AM
(Text-Only) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 6/17/2024: Settlement Conference - Settlement Reached. Digital Recording Minneapolis Courthouse, Courtroom Video Conference Time: 9:00 AM - 5:33 PM Total Time: 8 Hours & 33 Minutes SEALED Time: 5:33 PM - 5:38 PM Total SEALED Time: 5 Minutes APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff: Jody L. Winter, Nancy L. Hersh Eric McKinley - Plaintiff For Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, LLC: Kristen Lee Richer Tanya Rolo - Senior Counsel, Product Liability at Johnson & Johnson PROCEEDINGS: The parties are ordered to either finalize the settlement and submit a stipulation for dismissal within 45 days or send a joint letter to the Court explaining how much more time is required and the reason why. If requested, the transcript or portions of the transcript should be filed under SEAL and restricted to the parties and their counsel. (LNP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
26 26 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 03/08 10:37 AM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 6/10/2024 . Settlement Conference set for 6/17/2024 at 09:00 AM, CT by Zoom video (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 3/8/2024.(LNP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/07 6:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Lee Richer on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Reseach & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Richer, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/06 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lori B. Leskin on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Leskin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 05/25 1:01 PM
ORDER on (1125 in 0:15-md-02642-JRT) Stipulation. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/25/2022.Associated Cases: 0:15-md-02642-JRT, 0:21-cv-02665-JRT(HMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
22 22 notice Notice to Counsel to Comply with Pretrial Orders in Main MDL Case Wed 12/15 9:34 AM
(Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Fluoroquinolone Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2642-JRT . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2642-JRT . Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Fluoroquinolone MDL website at:[LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/content/Fluoroquinolone] . (kt)
Related: [-]
21 21 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Wed 12/15 9:24 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-06243. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL List.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
20 20 MDL TRANSFER ORDER: Case number 4:21-cv-06243-SBA is transferred to the District of Minnesota and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable John R. Tunheim to become part of MDL 2642. (dhm, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
19 19 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/1/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 17 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, f/k/a JOHNSON & JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC'S, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.'S, JOHNSON & JOHNSON'S, BAYER CORPORATION'S, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.'S, AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLCS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS.(amgS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
17 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, f/k/a JOHNSON & JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLCS, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.S, JOHNSON & JOHNSONS, BAYER CORPORATIONS, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.S, AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLCS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS; DECLARATION OF NOUSHAN NOUREDDINI IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
16 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/13/21. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 02:30 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 9/13/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
14 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
13 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Johnson & Johnson.. (Noureddini, Noushan) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 27, 2021
12 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2021. (wft, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
11 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eric McKinley.. (Hersh, Nancy) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
10 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC'S TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 20, 2021
9 9 STIPULATION STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLC, f/k/a JOHNSON & JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, LLCS, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., f/k/a ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.S, AND JOHNSON & JOHNSONS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 18, 2021
8 8 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on1 Notice of Removal, and have been added to this case: Bayer Corporation. (This is a text-only entry.) (Noureddini, Noushan) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
7 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Other Affiliate Janssen Research & Development, LLC, f/k/a Johnson & Johnson Pharmaceutical Research & Development, Other Affiliate Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2021 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . E-filer is reminded to enter the parties in the order as they were named in the State Court Complaint. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jo hnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, do not bypass the screen and ent er all affiliates or corporate parents. Re:2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Address for attorney James Murdica updated on the docket. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 13, 2021
5 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT AND OTHER RELATED DOCUMENTS (Noureddini, Noushan) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Noureddini, Noushan) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 12, 2021
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Noureddini, Noushan) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG21102314. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16278828). Filed byJanssen Research & Development, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Noureddini, Noushan) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet