Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:J P Stadtmueller
Case #: 2:21-cv-01424
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2021
Terminated:Oct 05, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2022 3:29 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
3500 Fifth LP
Represented By
Todd D Jex
Grady Hayes & Neary LLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Columbia Parking LP
Represented By
Todd D Jex
Grady Hayes & Neary LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
3500 Fifth LP
Represented By
Todd D Jex
Grady Hayes & Neary LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Columbia Parking LP
Represented By
Todd D Jex
Grady Hayes & Neary LLC
contact info
Defendant
3500 Fifth LP
Represented By
Todd D Jex
Grady Hayes & Neary LLC
contact info
Defendant
Columbia Parking LP
Represented By
Todd D Jex
Grady Hayes & Neary LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Secure Parking USA LLC
Represented By
David Seth Hill
Halling & Cayo Sc
contact info
Sean M Sweeney
Halling & Cayo Sc
contact info


Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/05 2:29 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/5/2022: ADOPTING14 Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Wed 10/05 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re15 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by 3500 Fifth LP, Columbia Parking LP ; This document should have been filed as an attachment. The proposed order should have been filed as an attachment to the stipulation for dismissal as text of proposed order. This document does not need to be re-filed The incorrect event was chosen; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (rcm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys Thu 10/06 8:13 AM
Case Terminated per16 . (rcm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/04 2:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Order for Dismissal by 3500 Fifth LP, Columbia Parking LP. (Jex, Todd)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/04 2:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Columbia Parking LP. (Jex, Todd)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Letter Tue 10/04 2:24 PM
LETTER from Attorney Todd Jex to Judge Stadtmueller . (Jex, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
12 12 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/06 11:26 AM
TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/6/2022. Interim Settlement Report due by 10/31/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2022; Final Settlement Report due by 2/13/2023; Motions in Limine and Rule 702 Motions due by 2/17/2023; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 2/22/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2023 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel) (ats)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Fri 06/03 8:26 AM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Hill, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
10 10 12 pgs order Order Fri 05/20 1:19 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 5/20/22. (cc: all counsel) (cl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
9 9 respm Reply (Non-Motion) Fri 04/01 12:30 PM
REPLY filed by All Plaintiffs . (Hill, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
8 8 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 03/18 1:31 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Jex, Todd)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 03/18 1:29 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Jex, Todd)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 03/18 1:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants filed by All Defendants. by All Defendants.(Jex, Todd)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/18 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd D Jex on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Todd D. Jex (Jex, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 01/13 10:56 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Hill, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
misc Case Opening Modification Thu 12/16 9:11 AM
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (rcm)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 12/16 9:11 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (rcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
3 3 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 12/15 4:01 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Secure Parking USA, LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hill, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/15 3:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M Sweeney on behalf of Secure Parking USA, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean M. Sweeney (Sweeney, Sean)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/15 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Secure Parking USA, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3996559)(Hill, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 309 Texas Lease,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 601 Wells Lease,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 201 Adams Lease,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 243 Exchange Lease,
Att: 5 Exhibit E -308 Cincinnati Lease,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - 191 Michigan Lease,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 12/15 11:45 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
Related: [-]