District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:James E Boasberg
Case #: 1:21-cv-03291
Nature of Suit151 Contract - Medicare Act
Cause42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2021
Terminated:Feb 02, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2022 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant
XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By
Bradley Silverman
Doj-Usao
contact info
Douglas C. Dreier
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
MASSENA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By
Joseph David Glazer
Law Office Of Joseph D. Glazer
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to Agency Order on Motion to Stay Thu 11/21 7:05 PM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's motion is GRANTED; 2) The matter is REMANDED to the Secretary of Health and Human Services to allow the Secretary to engage in further proceedings pursuant to Lake Region Healthcare Corp. v. Becerra , 113 F.4th 1002 (D.C. Cir. 2024); 3) This action is STAYED pending further order of the Court; and 4) Nothing in this Order should be construed as an admission of liability or concession of positions by either party nor a waiver of any available rights. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/21/2024. (lcjeb4)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Mon 03/28 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to OSWEGO HOSPITAL, CARTHAGE AREA HOSPITAL, MASSENA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, OSWEGO HOSPITAL, ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, CARTHAGE AREA HOSPITAL, MASSENA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. Attorney Joseph David Glazer terminated. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03098-JEB, 1:21-cv-03042-JEB, 1:21-cv-03043-JEB, 1:21-cv-03044-JEB, 1:21-cv-03291-JEB(Glazer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
notice Notice of Corrected Docket Entry Thu 02/17 8:34 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re13 Status Report, was entered in error. and counsel was instructed to only file in the lead case, Civil Action No. 20-3098 (ztth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
13 13 misc Status Report Wed 02/16 9:56 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by LAKE REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM, METHODIST FREMONT HEALTH, OSWEGO HOSPITAL, ASANTE, BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL BOONEVILLE, INC., BERWICK HOSPITAL CENTER, BIG SPRING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CARTHAGE AREA HOSPITAL, CLALLAM COUNTY PUBLIC HOSPITAL DISTRICT NO. 2, HENDRICK MEDICAL CENTER BROWNWOOD, LAKE REGIONAL HEALTH SYSTEM, MASSENA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, METHODIST FREMONT HEALTH, OSWEGO HOSPITAL, ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAN MIGUEL HOSPITAL CORPORATION, WOODWARD HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, CARTHAGE AREA HOSPITAL, BIG SPRING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, SAN MIGUEL HOSPITAL CORPORATION, MASSENA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, ROME MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-03098-JEB, 1:21-cv-02677-JEB, 1:21-cv-03042-JEB, 1:21-cv-03043-JEB, 1:21-cv-03044-JEB, 1:21-cv-03291-JEB, 1:22-cv-00043-JEB(Hettich, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Wed 02/02 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA Substituting for attorney Bradley G. Silverman (Dreier, Douglas)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 02/02 4:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Given the consolidation of Nos. 20-3098 21-2677 21-3042 21-3043 21-3044 21-3291 and 22-43, the Court ORDERS that: 1) All filings in these consolidated cases shall be made only in the first-filed case, No. 20-3098 2) The parties shall file a Joint Status Report concerning how they wish to proceed in these consolidated cases by February 16, 2022; and 3) The Clerk is directed to administratively close Nos. 21-2677 21-3042 21-3043 21-3044 21-3291 and 22-43. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/2/2022. (lcjeb2)
Related: [-]
utility Create Case Association Fri 02/04 9:55 AM
Cases Consolidated. Cases 21-2677 21-3042 21-3043 21-3044 21-3291 and 22-43, have been consolidated with case 20-3098 pursuant to an Order entered 2/2/2022. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead/earlier case, Civil Action No. 20-3098 The parties are advised NOT to elect the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (ztth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
11 11 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/02 8:52 AM
Case directly reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg as there is an earlier related case. Judge Trevor N. McFadden is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/20 5:06 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer due by 4/15/2022. (hmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/19 10:38 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by XAVIER BECERRA. (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 01/19 5:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting the10 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file its response to the1 Complaint on or before April 15, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/19/2022. (lctnm1)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 02, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 01/02 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA (Silverman, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 24, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Fri 12/24 3:56 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/23/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/21/2022. (Glazer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Fri 12/24 3:54 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/23/2021. (Glazer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Fri 12/24 3:53 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. XAVIER BECERRA served on 12/22/2021 (Glazer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
5 5 order .Order Tue 12/21 5:56 PM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/21/2021. (lctnm1)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12/21 3:59 PM
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 12/16 3:06 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to XAVIER BECERRA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/16 3:04 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (znmg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Wed 12/15 5:33 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MASSENA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Glazer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/15 5:32 PM
COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8932302) filed by MASSENA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL.(Glazer, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 PRRB Decision 2009,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 PRRB Decision 2012,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 PRRB Decision 2013,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Admin Decision 2009,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Admin Decision 2012,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 Admin Decsion 2013,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Summons Secretary HHS,
Att: 9 Summons Attorney General,
Att: 10 Summons US Attorney