Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael H Simon
Case #: 3:21-cv-01818
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2021
Terminated:Mar 01, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2022 1:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Ray Phillips
Represented By
Karen L. O'Connor
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Elliott J. Williams
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Ryan Kunkel
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Defendant
Turk Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By
Karen L. O'Connor
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Elliott J. Williams
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Ryan Kunkel
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shields Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By
Sally A Piefer
Lindner & Marsack, S.C.
contact info
Edward Choi
Bullard Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
order Dismissal (60-day) - Terminate Case Tue 03/01 9:12 AM
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Melissa Aubin. (mja)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
order 1 - Scheduling Fri 02/25 9:03 AM
ORDER - The parties have reported that this case has settled. The Telephone Conference set for February 25, 2022 and the two-day Evidentiary Hearing set March 1, 2022 are STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 24, 2022
47 47 oth_sup Brief Thu 02/24 12:26 PM
Supplemental Brief . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-]
46 46 oth_ans Response Thu 02/24 11:58 AM
Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (Kunkel, Ryan)
Related: [-] Order,41 .
order 1 - Scheduling Thu 02/24 8:40 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - The Court sets a Telephone Status Conference to discuss number of witnesses, total witness time needed, and related scheduling issues for upcoming preliminary injunction hearing for Friday, February 25, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
order 1 - Scheduling Wed 02/23 9:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER - The Court sets a Telephone Status Conference to discuss number of witnesses, total witness time needed, and related scheduling issues for upcoming preliminary injunction hearing for Friday, February 24, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
43 43 trial Witness List Tue 02/22 4:02 PM
Witness List Pre-Hearing Disclosure of Witnesses . Filed by All Defendants. (Kunkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
42 42 trial Witness List Tue 02/22 1:40 PM
Witness List . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
41 41 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/10 3:29 PM
ORDER - The Court requests supplemental briefing on the following legal question: Under Oregon law, must a separation agreement independently satisfy ORS § 653.295 if it extends the period of non-competition contained in an employee's employment agreement? The parties are limited to five pages and responses are due two weeks from the date of this Order. Signed on 2/10/2022 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (See attached order for details.) (mja)
Related: [-]
minute Status Conference Thu 02/10 9:53 AM
MINUTES OF TELEPHONE DISCOVERY HEARING: Discovery dispute discussed as stated on the record. Sally A. Piefer present as counsel for Plaintiff. Karen L. O'Conor, Ryan Kunkel, and Elliott J. Williams present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
order 1 - Scheduling Wed 02/09 4:00 PM
Scheduling Order - At the Plaintiff's request, the Court is setting a Telephone Conference to discuss a discovery dispute for 2/10/2022 at 09:00 a.m. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
38 38 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 01/31 4:35 PM
Stipulated Protective Order. Signed on 1/31/2022 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Protective Order Mon 01/31 2:54 PM
Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by All Defendants. (Kunkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
35 35 oth_sup Declaration Mon 01/24 4:06 PM
Declaration of Eric Wisnefsky . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
34 34 oth_sup Declaration Mon 01/24 4:05 PM
Declaration of Colin Wildschut . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
33 33 oth_sup Declaration Mon 01/24 4:04 PM
Declaration of Sally A. Piefer . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
32 32 oth_sup Declaration Mon 01/24 4:03 PM
Declaration of James Lowell . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
31 31 oth_sup Declaration Mon 01/24 4:02 PM
Declaration of Michael Giasante . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
30 30 oth_sup Declaration Mon 01/24 4:02 PM
Declaration of Scott Bourget . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
28 28 resp Reply to Motion Mon 01/24 3:57 PM
Reply in Support of Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 7 . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
27 27 order 1 - Scheduling Thu 01/20 2:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER - At the parties' request, Plaintiff's reply memorandum in support of order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue is extended from January 21, 2022 to January 24, 2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
26 26 oth_sup Declaration Fri 01/14 5:43 PM
Declaration of Thomas Sanford in Support of Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (O'Connor, Karen)
Related: [-] Response to Motion24 .
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
25 25 oth_sup Declaration Fri 01/14 5:41 PM
Declaration of Ray Phillips in Support of Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Filed by All Defendants. Related [+] (O'Connor, Karen)
Related: [-] Response to Motion24 .
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
24 24 resp Response to Motion Fri 01/14 5:24 PM
Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Filed by All Defendants. (O'Connor, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
23 23 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/10 4:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (O'Connor, Karen)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/10 3:56 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Turk Manufacturing, LLC, Ray Phillips. (O'Connor, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
21 21 order 1 - Scheduling Fri 01/07 10:14 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER - By stipulation of the parties, Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (ECF7 ) is WITHDRAWN. The case schedule outlined in the minutes of the telephone conference of December 22, 2021 (ECF 18 ) are STRICKEN. The Court adopts the parties' case schedule outlined in their stipulation and proposed order (ECF20 ) as follows: (1) Discovery to be served on parties by January 10, 2022 (limited to a total of 20 discovery requests under FRCP 33 and/or 34); (2) Defendants' answer to Plaintiff's amended complaint is due by January 10, 2022; (3) Defendants' legal memorandum opposing Plaintiff's order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue is due by January 14, 2022; (4) objections to discovery requests are due by January 17, 2022; (5) Plaintiff's reply memorandum in support of order to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue is due by January 21, 2022; (6) answers to interrogatories and production of requested documents is due by January 28, 2022; (7) depositions to be completed for preliminary injunction hearing by February 17, 2022 (depositions limited to two per side); (8) disclosure of the identity of witnesses for preliminary injunction hearing is due by February 22, 2022; and (9) a two-day Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for March 1, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
20 20 oth_doc Stipulation Wed 01/05 12:34 PM
Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Piefer, Sally)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES) Wed 12/29 3:04 PM
First Amended Complaint . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc. against Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
18 18 minute Scheduling Conference Wed 12/22 9:38 AM
MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: ORDER - As discussed on the record, the Court sets a briefing schedule as follows: Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF7 ) is due by January 14, 2022; Plaintiff's reply is due by January 19, 2022; and Oral Argument is set for January 25, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Sally A. Piefer and Edward Choi present as counsel for Plaintiff. Karen L. O'Connor present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Ryan White. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
17 17 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 12/21 12:24 PM
Scheduling Order - At the parties' request, the Court is setting a Telephone Conference to discuss a briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF7 ) for December 22, 2021 at 09:00AM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
16 16 service Certificate of Service Mon 12/20 2:20 PM
Certificate of Service by Shields Manufacturing, Inc. of Complaint,1 , Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 7 Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
15 15 order 1 - Scheduling Mon 12/20 12:19 PM
Scheduling Order - THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that Shields promptly provide a copy of this Scheduling Order to counsel for Phillips and Turk. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that counsel for Shields confer with counsel for Phillips and Turk regarding an appropriate briefing and hearing schedule for Shields' motion for TRO. Counsel for all parties should then contact the Courtroom Deputy to set either a briefing and hearing schedule or a telephonic scheduling conference with the Court. Signed 12/20/2021 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
14 14 oth_sup Declaration Fri 12/17 5:03 PM
Declaration of Matthew Yopchick . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
13 13 oth_sup Declaration Fri 12/17 5:02 PM
Declaration of Colin Wildschut . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
12 12 oth_sup Declaration Fri 12/17 4:56 PM
Declaration of Sally Piefer . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
11 11 oth_sup Declaration Fri 12/17 4:55 PM
Declaration of James Lowell . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
10 10 oth_sup Declaration Fri 12/17 4:54 PM
Declaration of Michael Giasante . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
9 9 oth_sup Declaration Fri 12/17 4:52 PM
Declaration of Shawn Ell . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. Related [+] (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order7 .
8 8 oth_doc Proposed Order (Show Cause Hrg) Fri 12/17 4:48 PM
Proposed Order for a Hearing to Show Cause . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 12/17 4:45 PM
Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
6 6 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Thu 12/16 3:00 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 4/15/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/16/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 5/16/2022. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jtj)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/16 11:21 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Sally A. Piefer (ECF4 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
attyadm Notice of Registration Requirement - Pro Hac Thu 12/16 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Sally A. Piefer is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit[LINK:ord.uscourts.gov/prohac] . Related [+] (ecp)
Related: [-] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,4 .
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 12/16 11:00 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Sally A. Piefer. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-83445474 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp) Modified on 12/16/2021 to Correct attorney Edward Choi to Sally A. Piefer (mja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
4 4 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/15 4:58 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Edward Choi. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8344547. Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/15 4:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_doc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/15 4:53 PM
Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,1 . Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc.. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/15 4:49 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8344511 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Shields Manufacturing, Inc. against All Defendants. (Choi, Edward)
Related: [-]