Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:21-cv-01753
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2021
Re-opened:Jun 10, 2024
Terminated:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 12, 2022 5:25 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Acumed, LLC
Represented By
Jason A. Engel
contact info
Steven L. Caponi
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Jeffrey Gelfand, MD
Represented By
Richard Charles Weinblatt
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info
Richard Juang
contact info
Tedd W. Van Buskirk
contact info
Ronald M. Daignault
contact info
Stamatios Stamoulis
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info
Chandran B. Iyer
contact info
Defendant
Acumed, LLC
Represented By
Jason A. Engel
contact info
Devon C. Beane
contact info
Megan E. O'Connor
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Steven L. Caponi
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Gelfand, MD
Represented By
Richard Charles Weinblatt
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info
Richard Juang
contact info
Tedd W. Van Buskirk
contact info
Ronald M. Daignault
contact info
Stamatios Stamoulis
Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC
contact info
Chandran B. Iyer
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Colson Medical, LLC
Terminated: 01/27/2022
Represented By
Steven L. Caponi
K&l Gates LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 10, 2024
42 42 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Mon 06/10 10:10 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,282,674 B2; US 9,149,312 B2.(kmd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation of Dismissal
41 41 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Mon 06/10 10:07 AM
SO ORDERED, re (40 in 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 37 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/10/2024. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(kmd)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Case Reopened Mon 06/10 10:06 AM
Case reopened. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(kmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/05 2:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
39 39 misc Letter Fri 05/31 4:55 PM
Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Steven L. Caponi regarding Status of Inter-Parties' Review Proceeding - re38 Order Administratively Closing Case.(Caponi, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, November 04, 2022
38 38 2 pgs order Order Administratively Closing Case Fri 11/04 2:41 PM
ORDER. Case is closed for administrative purposes with leave to reopen if further attention by the Court is required (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/4/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(kmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
37 37 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Case Stayed Fri 10/28 2:04 PM
SO ORDERED, re (32 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC, 35 in 1:21-cv-01753-CFC) Stipulation Order Regarding Stay, filed by Arthrex, Inc. Cases stayed. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/28/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(kmd)
Related: [-]
36 36 order SO ORDERED Fri 10/28 1:59 PM
SO ORDERED, re (31 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC, 34 in 1:21-cv-01753-CFC) Stipulation of Dismissal of Claims Relating to U.S. Patent No. 8,282,674, filed by Arthrex, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/28/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(kmd)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Fri 10/28 11:56 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Stay re (31 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC, 34 in 1:21-cv-01753-CFC) Stipulation of Dismissal by Arthrex, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/28 11:53 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Relating to U.S. Patent No. 8,282,674 by Arthrex, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
33 33 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/07 5:49 PM
MOTION for Claim Construction - filed by Arthrex, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/07 3:22 PM
MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Claim Construction re (28 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC, 31 in 1:21-cv-01753-CFC) Claim Construction Chart - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Claim Construction Chart Fri 10/07 3:14 PM
CLAIM Construction Chart by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD.(Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Friday, September 16, 2022
30 30 discov Notice of Service Fri 09/16 8:46 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Jeffrey Gelfand, MDs Proposed Claim Constructions for Identified Terms filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD.(Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
29 29 discov Notice of Service Fri 09/16 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Acumed, LLC and Arthrex, Inc.s Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Arthrex, Inc..(Farnan, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
28 28 discov Notice of Service Fri 09/02 8:57 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Jeffrey Gelfand, MDs Identification of Claim Terms filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD.(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
27 27 discov Notice of Service Tue 05/31 10:47 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD.(Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
26 26 discov Notice of Service Tue 05/31 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Acumed, LLC's Initial Disclosures filed by Acumed, LLC.(Caponi, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
25 25 order Protective Order Thu 05/19 3:32 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/19/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
24 24 misc Proposed Order Wed 05/18 4:58 PM
Joint PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/12 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E. O'Connor on behalf of Acumed, LLC (O'Connor, Megan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
22 22 order SO ORDERED Tue 05/10 10:09 AM
SO ORDERED, re (21 in 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 18 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Protective Order to May 18, 2022, filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/10/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
21 21 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 05/09 10:12 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Protective Order to May 18, 2022 - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 28, 2022
20 20 order Scheduling Order - Patent Thu 04/28 4:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2022. Fact Discovery completed by 6/16/2023. Expert Discovery due by 10/20/2023. A Status and Scheduling Conference is set for 1/24/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2023. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 1/20/2023. A Markman Hearing is set for 2/23/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2024. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/29/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Jury Trial is set for 3/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/28/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(nmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
19 19 misc Letter Tue 04/26 2:32 PM
Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Richard C. Weinblatt regarding Proposed Scheduling Order.(Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
order Oral Order Tue 04/26 8:50 AM
ORAL ORDER: The parties having failed to comply with the Court's Order of March 31, 2022 (18 in 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 15 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC Order Setting Scheduling Conference); IT IS ORDERED that the April 27, 2022 Scheduling Conference is canceled. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/26/2022. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
18 18 2 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Thu 03/31 12:09 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Telephonically before Judge Colm F. Connolly. If the parties have no disputes about the scheduling order, the Court will not require the parties to appear at a conference. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/31/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(nmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
17 17 misc Letter Wed 03/09 1:06 PM
Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Richard C. Weinblatt regarding the Need for Consolidated Discovery and/or Markman Proceedings - re (12 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC, 12 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC) Order,, Set Deadlines,. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
16 16 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 02/28 2:49 PM
ANSWER to13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD.(Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/09 3:49 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, on or before March 9, 2022, counsel for plaintiff shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/9/2022.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/9/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(nmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Tue 02/08 8:16 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Devon C. Beane for Acumed, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 02/07 4:22 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc. for Acumed, LLC filed by Acumed, LLC. (Caponi, Steven)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 02/07 4:20 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Defendant Acumed, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff Jeffery Gelfand, MD's Complaint and Counterclaims , COUNTERCLAIM against Jeffrey Gelfand, MD by Acumed, LLC.(Caponi, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
order SO ORDERED Fri 02/04 8:50 AM
SO ORDERED, re (12 in 1:21-cv-01753-CFC), (9 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tedd W. Van Buskirk, filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/4/2022. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(kmd)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 02/04 2:37 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Tedd W. Van Buskirk for Jeffrey Gelfand, MD added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases:1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(srs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/03 9:06 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Tedd W. Van Buskirk - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 02/03 9:31 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jason A. Engel for Acumed, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/02 3:09 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason A. Engel, Devon C. Beane, and Jonah B. Heemstra - filed by Acumed, LLC. (Caponi, Steven)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Wed 02/02 3:18 PM
SO ORDERED, re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason A. Engel, Devon C. Beane, and Jonah B. Heemstra, filed by Acumed, LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/2/2022. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
utility Remark Thu 01/27 10:44 AM
Remark: Case was inadvertently closed. The case has been reopened. Defendant Colson Medical, LLC has been terminated. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 01/25 9:15 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD as to Colson Medical, LLC (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Tue 12/28 9:21 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ronald M. Daignault,Chandran B. Iyer,Richard Juang for Jeffrey Gelfand, MD added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 27, 2021
order SO ORDERED Mon 12/27 9:22 AM
SO ORDERED, re (7 in 1:21-cv-01754-CFC)(9 in 1:21-cv-01753-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer and Richard Juang, filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/27/2021. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC(kmd)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 12/27 9:58 AM
SO ORDERED, re8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to February 7, 2022, filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Reset Answer Deadlines: Acumed, LLC answer due 2/7/2022; Colson Medical, LLC answer due 2/7/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/27/2021. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/23 11:04 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer and Richard Juang - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 12/23 11:08 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Respond to Complaint to February 7, 2022 - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/23 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Caponi on behalf of Acumed, LLC, Colson Medical, LLC (Caponi, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 12/22 10:41 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01753-CFC, 1:21-cv-01754-CFC (rjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/20 7:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Colson Medical, LLC served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/20 7:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD. Acumed, LLC served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Weinblatt, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 12/15 8:24 AM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Acumed, LLC on 12/14/2021; Colson Medical, LLC on 12/14/2021.(apk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Wed 12/15 8:21 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,282,674 B2 ;US 9,149,312 B2. (apk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 12/15 8:19 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/15 8:19 AM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Acumed, LLC, Colson Medical, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3763159.) - filed by Jeffrey Gelfand, MD.(apk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet