New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:21-cv-10751
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2022 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC
5600 North River Road
Rosemont, IL 60018
Represented By
Evan Benjamin Citron
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Lopez
On Behalf Of Himself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates 150 E. 18 St.
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, October 28, 2022
17 17 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 10/28 11:16 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Victor Lopez. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 10/27 1:04 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for an initial case management and scheduling conference, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on November 30, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. The conference will be held remotely by telephone. The parties are instructed to call the Court at (877) 411-9748 and use access code 3029857#. PLAINTIFF, OR COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF(S) SHALL NOTIFY ALL PARTIES IN WRITING AND PROVIDE ALL PARTIES WITH A COPY OF THIS NOTICE ANDTHE ATTACHED CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER, UNLESS THE CASE HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM STATE COURT, IN WHICH EVENT COUNSEL FOR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT(S) SHALL PROVIDE SUCH NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES.Telephonic Initial Conference set for 11/30/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (ama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/25 2:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC..(Citron, Evan)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/25 2:49 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Humphreys Accessories LLC for Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC. Document filed by Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC..(Citron, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/26 11:47 AM
ORDER: granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re12 THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Evan B. Citron dated April 25, 2022. Defendant's request to extend the deadline to respond to the Complaint is granted. No further adjournments will be granted except on good cause shown. SO ORDERED. Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC answer due 5/25/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/26/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 25, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/25 5:37 PM
THIRD LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Evan B. Citron dated April 25, 2022. Document filed by Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC..(Citron, Evan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/24 6:12 PM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re10 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Evan B. Citron dated March 24, 2022.,1 Complaint. Defendant's request for an extension of time to April 25, 2022 to respond to the complaint is granted. Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC answer due 4/25/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/24/2022) (rro)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/24 5:23 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Evan B. Citron dated March 24, 2022. Document filed by Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC..(Citron, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/23 11:04 AM
ORDER: granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Evan B. Citron dated 2/22/2022. Defendant's request for an extension of time to March 24, 2022 to respond to the complaint is Granted. SO ORDERED. Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC answer due 3/24/2022. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/23/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 02/22 9:31 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Evan B. Citron dated 2/22/2022. Document filed by Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC..(Citron, Evan)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/22 9:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan Benjamin Citron on behalf of Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC..(Citron, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 01/05 1:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC waiver sent on 12/24/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. Document filed by Victor Lopez..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 12/16 11:24 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC..(sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Thu 12/16 11:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 12/16 11:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 12/16 11:20 AM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 12/16 11:22 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/15 5:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Victor Lopez..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 12/15 5:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 12/15 5:40 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Lopez..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/15 5:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Randa Accessories Leather Goods LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25474952)Document filed by Victor Lopez..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]