New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:14-cv-06432
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332oc Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2014
Terminated:Aug 20, 2014
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 10:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Perkins Eastman Architects, D.P.C.
Plaintiff
Kohler Ronan, LLC
Represented By
Peter James Martin
Hinckley Allen & Snyder (ct)
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, August 20, 2014
6 6 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Rule 4l(a)(l)(a)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the foregoing action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk shall close the case. So Ordered. (lnl)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Kohler Ronan, LLC. (Martin, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 15, 2014
4 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kohler Ronan, LLC.(Martin, Peter)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter James Martin on behalf of Kohler Ronan, LLC. (Martin, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 11, 2014
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rj)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Perkins Eastman Architects, D.P.C. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401102272)Document filed by Kohler Ronan, LLC.(rj)
Related: [-]
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Perkins Eastman Architects, D.P.C. (rj)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (rj)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. (rj)
Related: [-]