Texas Western District Court
Judge:Jason K Pulliam
Case #: 5:21-cv-01247
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 15, 2021
Terminated:Mar 16, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 16, 2023
26 26 order Judgment Thu 03/16 3:47 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT, It is Ordered that Defendant Jasmine Kszans Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiff Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr.s Section 1983 Civil Rights Complaint (ECF No. 1) against Officer Kszan is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the above-entitled cause of action is hereby CLOSED. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
Related: [-]
25 25 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 03/16 3:44 PM
ORDER DENYING re24 MOTION Hand Writing Expert filed by Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr., GRANTING22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jasmine Kszan, Plaintiffs claim that Officer Kszan violated his right to free speech by refusing to deliver his letter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/19 10:52 AM
PRO-SE MOTION for Hand Writing Expert by Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr. (wg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
23 23 3 pgs order Order Mon 11/28 7:43 AM
ORDER, that the Plaintiff is advised that if he wishes to file a response to DefendantsMotion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 22), he must do so no later than December 21, 2022. re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jasmine Kszan. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
22 22 motion Summary Judgment Fri 11/18 9:09 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jasmine Kszan.(Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
21 21 trial Witness/Exhibit/Expert List Wed 09/14 12:18 PM
WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by Jasmine Kszan . (Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
20 20 adr ADR Report - Other Mon 08/01 12:14 PM
ADR Report Filed - by Jasmine Kszan(Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
19 19 misc Advisory to the Court Thu 07/21 11:18 AM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Jasmine Kszan Regarding Scheduling Order Deadline as to Settlement Offer . (Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 07/12 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
17 17 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Tue 06/21 10:30 AM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Jasmine Kszan. (Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
16 16 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Thu 06/02 10:18 AM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 05/27 3:02 PM
ORDER GRANTING7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants: Comal County Jail and Comal County Sheriff's Office Terminated. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (bc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
14 14 2 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment - TDCJ Thu 05/26 2:28 PM
AMENDED ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr., Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $24.00. If this amount has not already been deducted, TDCJ must deduct this sum from Plaintiffs institutional trust fund account and forward it to the U.S. Clerk of Court, 262 W. Nueva, Suite1-400, San Antonio, Texas 78207. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, the prisoner shall be required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding months income credited to the prisoners account. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment - TDCJ Thu 05/26 10:31 AM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr., The United States Clerk of Court (the Clerk) is, therefore, directed to email a copy of this Order to the Custodian of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice (TDCJ) Inmate Trust Fund. In this case, the Court assessed Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $24.00.If this amount has not already been deducted, TDCJ must deduct this sum from Plaintiffs institutional trust fund account and forward it to the U.S. Clerk of Court, 262 W. Nueva, Suite1-400, San Antonio, Texas 78207. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 05/19 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 22, 2022
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/22 12:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 8/1/2022, Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2022, Discovery due by 10/19/2022, Motions due by 11/18/2022,. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/22 12:12 PM
ADVISORY TO PLAINTIFF--Plaintiff is advised that if he wishes to file a response to either pleading, he must do so on or by May 20, 2022.. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 21, 2022
misc Remark (No Doc#) Thu 04/21 10:20 AM
Remark: Due to filing Regarding address of Plaintiff by defts., Plaintiff's address has been updated. (wg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
9 9 misc Advisory to the Court Wed 04/20 4:44 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Comal County Jail, Comal County Sheriff's Department, Jasmine Kszan Regarding Return of Documents Served on Plaintiff .(Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, April 04, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/04 2:30 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Michael A. Shaunessy added to party Jasmine Kszan(pty:dft) by Jasmine Kszan.(Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/04 2:29 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Comal County Jail, Comal County Sheriff's Department.(Shaunessy, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/31 11:03 AM
USM/285'S Returned Executed by Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr. Comal County Jail served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022; Comal County Sheriff's Department served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022; Jasmine Kszan served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. (wg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 02/07 11:06 AM
USM/285'S & Summons Issued with Copy of Order & Complaint as to Comal County Jail, Comal County Sheriff's Department, Jasmine Kszan. Forwarded to the US Marshall for service on Defts. (wg)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs order Order Order Directing Prisoner Payment - NON-TDCJ ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 02/04 3:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP and DIRECTING SERVICE re2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr., ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Roy Wright Vaughan, Jr., The Clerk of the Court ("the Clerk") is directed to mail a copy of this Order to:Coma! County Sheriffs Office Attn: Fiscal. It is also Ordered that the Clerk of Court shall request the U.S. Marshal serve Defendants, Comal County Sheriffs Department, Comal County Jail and Officer Jasmine Kszan, Badge #3355, with a summons and a copy of Plaintiff s Civil Rights Complaint (ECF No.1), by certified U.S. Mail return receipt requested. The Clerk shall a!so send a courtesy copy of this Order by regular mail to Michael A. Shaunessy,McGinnis, Lochbridge & Kilgore, 600 Congress Avenue, Suite 2100, Austin, Texas 78701. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (wg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
3 3 misc Case Opening Letter Thu 12/16 2:35 PM
Case Opening Letter to Roy Wright Vaughn, Jr. (fs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/16 2:29 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roy Wright Vaughn, Jr. (fs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/16 2:28 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Roy Wright Vaughn, Jr.(fs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Copy of Envelope