Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00502
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2021
Last checked: Friday Dec 17, 2021 2:44 AM EST
Defendant
KAUNG MYAT KYAW (1)
Represented By
Marvin Miller
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Carolyn J. Bloch
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cindy K. Chung
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/09/2023 12:04 PM EST
Thursday, November 18, 2021
Duty Magistrate Judge assigned to case. If a sealed mj case was opened, sealed access rights have been granted. (lyk) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT (Bloch, Carolyn) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Affidavit,
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Warrant
2 2 1 pgs MOTION FOR ARREST WARRANT BASED UPON A CRIMINAL COMPLAINT by USA as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW. (Bloch, Carolyn) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 Government's Request for Detention as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW (Bloch, Carolyn) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
5 5 SIGNED COMPLAINT as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW. (et) Modified text on 11/19/2021. (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Friday, November 19, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Initial Appearance as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW held on 11/18/2021. Initial Appearance as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW held on 11/18/2021. The Initial Appearance could not be conducted. The defendant, through his counsel Attorney Sarah Levin, requested a Burmese Interpreter. The court rescheduled his Initial Appearance to 11/19/2021 at 2:15pm. (Court Reporter: by video) Text-only entry; No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (et) Modified text on 11/22/2021. (map) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW Initial Appearance set for 11/19/2021 02:15 PM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW Initial Appearance set for 11/19/2021 02:30 PM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting2 Motion for Arrest Warrant as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/18/2021. (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW: Initial Appearance set for 11/18/2021 04:30 PM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/18/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
8 8 Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW. In accordance with Administrative Order 2:20-mc-466, Defendant consents to proceeding by video conferencing/teleconferencing as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/18/2021. (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Initial Appearance as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW held on 11/19/2021 Interpreter: THIN THIN CONLON (Court Reporter: by video) (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by KAUNG MYAT KYAW (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
11 11 Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW. In accordance with Administrative Order 2:20-mc-466, Defendant consents to proceeding by video conferencing/teleconferencing as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/19/2021. (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020) (amending Fed. R. Crim. Pro. 5) as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/19/2021. (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER Scheduling a Detention Hearing as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW. Pending the hearing, the defendant is to be detained in the custody of the United States Marshal or any other authorized officer. The custodian must bring the defendant to the hearing(s) at the time, date, and place set forth below. Detention Hearing set for 12/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. Preliminary Examination set for 12/10/2021 10:00 AM in Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/19/2021. (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
14 14 CJA 20 ORDER Appointing Counsel as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW: Appointment of Attorney Marvin Miller for KAUNG MYAT KYAW Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/19//2021. (et) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
15 15 NOTICE Proposed Release Plan by KAUNG MYAT KYAW(Miller, Marvin) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit D
16 16 Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW. In accordance with Administrative Order 2:20-mc-466, Defendant consents to proceeding by video conferencing/teleconferencing as more fully stated in said Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 12/10/2021. (jmb) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan: A Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW was held on 12/10/2021 Interpreter: Thin Thin Leong Conlon. Language: Burmese. The Defendant requires a Burmese interpreter and Thin Thin Leong Conlon was utilized for the hearing held 12/10/2021. The interpreter is sworn, and the Defendant agrees to participate via video conference. This is identified as a presumption case. Defense counsel informs the Court he will waive the Preliminary Examination and proceed only as to detention. Special Agent Jordan Slavik is sworn and testifies. Argument is made. The Court outlines the four factors of the Bail Reform Act. The Court finds the Defendant to be a flight risk as well as a danger to the community and that no conditions can be fashioned for his release. The Defendant is ordered detained. An appropriate order will be entered. (Court Reporter: Marsia Balobeck) (jmb) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
18 18 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by KAUNG MYAT KYAW. (jmb) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER of Detention Pending Trial as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 12/10/2021. (jmb) [2:21-mj-02228-MPK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
20 20 INDICTMENT as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW (1) count(s) 1-4. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions,
Att: 2 Arraignment Plea,
Att: 3 Criminal Case Info Sheet
21 21 Indictment MEMORANDUM as to KAUNG MYAT KYAW (sdp)
Related: [-]