Russ v. Canal Barge Company, Inc.
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Greg Gerard Guidry |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-02325 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Dec 17, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 15, 2022 3:47 AM CDT |
Defendant
Canal Barge Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. W. Russ
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
![]() ORDER granting36 Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/14/2023. (js) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 07/14 9:48 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re36 Joint MOTION for Settlement Agreement Approval. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date. (js) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Joint MOTION for Settlement Agreement Approval by Benjamin Taylor Noonan, L. W. Russ. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/13/2023.(O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Consent to Removal by Nashall Williams(O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
34 | 34
![]() NOTICE by Nashall Williams re25 Consent and Joinder WITHDRAWAL OF CONSENT TO JOIN . (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court having been advised by counsel for the defendant that all parties to this action have firmly agreed upon a compromise agreement, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs, but without prejudice to the right upon good cause shown, to reopen or to seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if settlement is not consummated within sixty (60) days. During this sixty-day period, the Court retains jurisdiction for all purposes, including approval of the settlement agreement under the Fair Labor Standards Act and enforcing the settlement agreement entered into by the parties. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/16/2023.(js) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
![]() ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A settlement conference in the above matter is hereby SCHEDULED, by telephone, for May 10, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael B. North. Each party shall provide, in confidence, a concise settlement memorandum. This memorandum shall be submitted at least two (2) full business days before the conference. The memorandum shall be emailed directly to: efile-north@laed.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 4/12/23.(cg) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 02/22 11:18 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re29 Witness and Exhibit List. **Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section (T) and Magistrate (5).** (am) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 02/22 11:15 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re28 Witness and Exhibit List. All future pleadings must include the case number, District Judge Greg Gerard Guidry (T), and Magistrate Judge Michael North (5).** (am) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Witness and Exhibit List by Canal Barge Company, Inc.. (Bowdler, Bryan) |
|
28 | 28
![]() Witness and Exhibit List by Benjamin Taylor Noonan, L. W. Russ. (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ORDER granting26 Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 5/24/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial reset for 6/26/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 3/8/2023. All other deadlines set forth in document. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 12/1/2022.(mm) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Canal Barge Company, Inc..(Bowdler, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Consent and Joinder as plaintiff by N. Williams Attorney Kerry O'Brien added to party N. Williams(pty:pla).(O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Consent and Joinder as plaintiff by B. T. Noonan Attorney Kerry O'Brien added to party B. T. Noonan(pty:pla).(O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Wednesday, June 22, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER granting22 Motion for Approval and Issuance of Notice to FlSA Collective as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 6/21/2022. (mm) |
|
Friday, June 17, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION FOR APPROVAL AND ISSUANCE OF NOTICE TO FLSA COLLECTIVE by L. W. Russ.(O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Thursday, June 16, 2022 | ||
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Thu 06/16 11:38 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re18 Joint Status Report. **1. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s). 2. Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (5).** (mm) |
||
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Thu 06/16 11:43 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re19 Joint Status Report. **Per the filing Attorney, this is a duplicate filing of document 18. Document has been marked filed in error. See record document 18 for correct entry.** (mm) |
||
Monday, June 13, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by L. W. Russ (Farrugia, Victor) |
|
18 | 18
![]() STATUS REPORT JOINT by L. W. Russ (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 2/27/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry.Issued by Clerk for the Court.(dp) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 4/14/2022 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 03/22 9:46 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re14 Response to Order to Show Cause. **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (5).** (mm) |
||
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by L. W. Russ re13 Order,(O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 17, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() SHOW CAUSE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that on or before March 24, 2022, plaintiff is instructed to show good cause, in writing, why plaintiff's counsel have failed to follow the Court's Orders as stated herein. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 3/17/2022.(mm) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE Scheduling Conference reset for 3/17/2022 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp) |
|
Tuesday, February 15, 2022 | ||
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 02/15 9:53 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re10 Notice (Other). **Letters to the Court should be delivered to Chambers - not filed in the court's record. A letter is not filed in the record unless specifically ordered by the court or letter is an exhibit attached to a properly formatted motion. All filings in the record should comply with L.R. 10.1 as to form of pleadings.** (mm) |
||
Monday, February 14, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE by L. W. Russ Attorney Vacation Notice . (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Thursday, February 10, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2022 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(dp) |
|
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Canal Barge Company, Inc..Attorney Bryan Edward Bowdler added to party Canal Barge Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bowdler, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kerry O'Brien. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 01/11/2022. (ko) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, January 10, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kerry Vincent OBrien (Fee previously paid) by L. W. Russ.(Farrugia, Victor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, January 07, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9173470) by L. W. Russ.(Farrugia, Victor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, December 20, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to Canal Barge Company, Inc. (lw) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 12/20 2:28 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet and the Summons. The pdf should have been flattened. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click PRINT to adobe pdf to flatten the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (lw) |
|
Friday, December 17, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 12/17 11:57 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT with jury demand against Canal Barge Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9151285) filed by Landan W. Russ.Attorney Victor Roma Farrugia added to party Landan W. Russ(pty:selreq).(Farrugia, Victor) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |