Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Gregory K Frizzell
Referred: Mark T Steele
Case #: 4:21-cv-00545
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2021
Terminated:Jan 25, 2024
Case in other court:Tulsa Cty Dist Ct, CJ-21-03375
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 15, 2022 3:42 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Weil Group Resources, LLC
Represented By
James Michael Love
Titus Hillis Reynolds Love Dickman & Mccalmon
contact info
Counter Defendant
Quest EPC LLC
Represented By
Michael Terence Keester
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tulsa)
contact info
Lauren Michele Marciano
Hall Estill
contact info
Defendant
Weil Group Resources, LLC
Represented By
James Michael Love
Titus Hillis Reynolds Love Dickman & Mccalmon
contact info
Plaintiff
Quest EPC LLC
Represented By
Michael Terence Keester
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (tulsa)
contact info
Lauren Michele Marciano
Hall Estill
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, January 25, 2024
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/25 12:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Quest EPC LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
Related: [-]
utility Case - Terminate Civil/Miscellaneous Case Fri 01/26 8:40 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (see document number32 ) (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
31 31 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Ruling on Motion to Amend Thu 10/19 4:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Fourth Amended Scheduling Order) ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 6/28/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 7/26/2024, Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting30 Motion to Amend Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 30 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order
30 30 motion Amend Thu 10/19 12:23 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order Related [+] by Quest EPC LLC (Keester, Michael)
Related: [-] 29 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s),
Thursday, August 17, 2023
29 29 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Thu 08/17 2:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Third Amended Scheduling Order) ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/29/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 1/26/2024, Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting28 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 28 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s)
Monday, August 14, 2023
28 28 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Mon 08/14 2:53 PM
Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Related [+] by Quest EPC LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
Related: [-] 26 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s),
Thursday, May 04, 2023
order 02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Case - Number Changed Thu 05/04 10:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 23-6 , reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Mark T Steele, Magistrate Judge Christine D Little no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 21-CV-545-GKF-MTS (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
26 26 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Tue 02/21 4:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Second Amended Scheduling Order) ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 8/28/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2023, Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting25 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Related [+] (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 25 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Scheduling Order
25 25 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Tue 02/21 2:50 PM
Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Scheduling Order Related [+] by Quest EPC LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
Related: [-] 24 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s),
Thursday, September 29, 2022
24 24 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Thu 09/29 12:47 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Amended Scheduling Order) ; setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 4/28/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2023, Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell); granting23 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
23 23 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Wed 09/28 4:38 PM
Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Related [+] by Quest EPC LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
Related: [-] 19 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s),
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
22 22 order 07 - Protective Order Ruling on Motion for Protective Order Tue 07/05 10:38 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little ; granting21 Motion for Protective Order (LML, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
21 21 motion Protective Order Thu 06/02 5:48 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Weil Group Resources, LLC (With attachments) (Love, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
20 20 order 02 - Minute Order Thu 04/07 11:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell The Court has a significant number of criminal cases awaiting trial due to the decision of the Supreme Court in McGirt v. United States, 140 S. Ct. 2452 (2020). Criminal cases must be tried before civil cases, and civil cases will most likely not be tried by a district judge unless and until all criminal cases on a monthly trial docket have been resolved or continued. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, the parties in a civil case may consent to a trial before a magistrate judge, and this option is available for civil litigants who wish to have a jury trial. The AO-85 consent forms are available on the U.S. District Court website. However, the parties are free to withhold consent to a trial before a magistrate judge without any adverse consequences, and the parties are reminded of this option only as a possible means of expediting a civil trial in cases in which the parties desire to expedite the final resolution of their case. The parties may also request an additional settlement conference at any time. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
19 19 order 05 - Scheduling Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Scheduling Order Date(s) Thu 03/31 1:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 10/28/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2022, Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 3/20/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
18 18 misc Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1) Tue 03/08 8:26 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Quest EPC LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
17 17 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Tue 02/22 5:31 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 3/8/2022); granting16 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (lah, Chambers)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Tue 02/22 4:30 PM
Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) to File JSR Related [+] by Quest EPC LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
Related: [-] 14 Order, Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
15 15 respoth Answer Tue 02/08 3:13 PM
ANSWER Related [+] by Quest EPC LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
Related: [-] 13 Counterclaim
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
14 14 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Wed 01/26 3:49 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 2/22/2022) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
13 13 cmp Counterclaim Tue 01/18 3:59 PM
COUNTERCLAIM against Quest EPC LLC by Weil Group Resources, LLC (Love, James)
Related: [-]
12 12 respoth Answer Tue 01/18 3:58 PM
ANSWER Related [+] by Weil Group Resources, LLC (Love, James)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Tue 12/28 11:16 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Weil Group Resources, LLC (Love, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Tue 12/28 9:50 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quest EPC LLC (Marciano, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
9 9 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/22 11:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Quest EPC LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
8 8 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 12/21 4:14 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Terence Keester on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Michael Terence Keester added to party Quest EPC LLC(pty:pla).] (Keester, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 order 01 - Order Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/21 3:47 PM
ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting defendant until 1/17/2022 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint. ; granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lah, Chambers)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/21 2:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead Related [+] by Weil Group Resources, LLC (Love, James)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
5 5 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/21 8:28 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Weil Group Resources, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
4 4 notice Appearance - Attorney Mon 12/20 3:04 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Michael Love on behalf of Weil Group Resources, LLC (Love, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Status Report on Removed Action Mon 12/20 3:03 PM
STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Weil Group Resources, LLC (Love, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Mon 12/20 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2021-3375 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2531673) by Weil Group Resources, LLC (With attachments) (Love, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/20 2:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Weil Group Resources, LLC (Love, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
cmp State Court Petition/Complaint Fri 12/17 4:02 PM
PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Weil Group Resources, LLC by Quest EPC LLC (bjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]