Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 5:14-cv-00730
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 15, 2014
Terminated:Feb 22, 2016
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 9:15 AM CDT
Defendant
Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC
Represented By
Matthew William Bobo
Law Office Of Matthew Bobo PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kadee Helmick
Represented By
Kenneth Ernest Grubbs
Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, February 22, 2016
39 39 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/22 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kadee Helmick (Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2016
38 38 order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 01/20 2:02 PM
ORDER for Settlement Papers. The parties shall submit a stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgment and any appropriate supporting documents on or before Monday, February 22, 2016. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2016
37 37 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 01/19 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Kadee Helmick (Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2015
36 36 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/02 2:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2016 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 3/14/2016 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2015
35 35 notice Notice Fri 10/23 4:46 PM
NOTICE status report by Kadee Helmick (Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
34 34 order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 09/16 9:52 AM
ORDER, hearing set for September 16, 2015, is Cancelled. Motions DENIED AS MOOT29 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Kadee Helmick. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
33 33 order Order ~Util - Set Motion Hearings Wed 08/26 5:03 PM
ORDER, Reset Motion Hearing for29 MOTION to Compel Discovery ( Motion Hearing reset for 9/16/2015 2:00 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad). Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 17, 2015
32 32 order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Mon 08/17 4:40 PM
ORDER Resetting Hearing on29 MOTION to Compel Discovery : Motion Hearing reset for 8/27/2015 10:30 AM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 05, 2015
31 31 order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Wed 08/05 11:29 AM
ORDER Setting Hearing on29 MOTION to Compel Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2015 2:30 PM before Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2015
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 07/23 10:11 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC amending1 Complaint filed by Kadee Helmick.(aej)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 07/23 9:10 AM
Text Order GRANTING28 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 07/23 9:11 AM
Text Order REFERRING29 Motion to Compel Discovery to U.S. Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Thu 07/23 10:05 AM
MOTION REFERRED: referred29 MOTION to Compel Discovery . Referral Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (aej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2015
29 29 motion Compel Wed 07/22 4:40 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Kadee Helmick.(Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1&2,
Att: 2 Exhibit 3&4,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
28 28 motion Leave to File Document Wed 07/22 1:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Kadee Helmick.(Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, July 13, 2015
order Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 07/13 10:42 AM
Text Order GRANTING27 Agreed Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. The discovery deadline is extended to September 25, 2015. The dispositive motions deadline is extended to October 25, 2015. The Court advises the parties that no further extensions will be granted. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/13 11:52 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 9/25/2015, Motions due by 10/25/2015, (aej)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 10, 2015
27 27 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 07/10 5:26 PM
Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Kadee Helmick.(Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 11, 2015
order Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 05/11 1:54 PM
Text Order GRANTING26 Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. The discovery deadline is extended to July 24, 2015. The dispositive motions deadline is extended to August 28, 2015. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/11 3:48 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/24/2015, Motions due by 8/28/2015 (aej)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 08, 2015
26 26 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 05/08 10:16 AM
MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Kadee Helmick.(Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 10, 2015
order Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 04/10 8:37 AM
Text Order GRANTING25 Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. The discovery deadline is extended to May 22, 2015, the dispositive motions deadline is extended to June 25, 2015. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ks)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/10 11:58 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/22/2015, Motions due by 6/25/2015 (aej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2015
25 25 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 04/09 9:23 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Kadee Helmick and Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC.(Grubbs, Kenneth) Modified on 4/9/2015 to add defendant as a filer(sf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Notice of Correction Thu 04/09 9:34 AM
Notice of Correction: ***ADVISED COUNSEL - DEFENDANT WAS ADDED AS A JOINT FILER*** RE:25 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines . (sf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 27, 2015
24 24 trial Expert Witness List Tue 01/27 10:56 AM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Kadee Helmick. (Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 08, 2015
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 01/08 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew William Bobo (Bobo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 17, 2014
22 22 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 12/18 2:08 PM
ORDER DENYING6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (rf)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 12/17 12:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David A. Ezra: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2014 re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Kristin Anderson.)(aej)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Taken Under Advisement Wed 12/17 12:30 PM
Motions Taken Under Advisement:6 MOTION to Dismiss (aej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 11, 2014
20 20 adr ADR Report - Other Thu 12/11 1:23 PM
ADR Report Filed - first amended by Kadee Helmick(Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Deficiency Notice Thu 12/11 12:20 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING ATTORNEY SIGNATURE ON PLEADING AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE*** re 18 ADR Report - Other (aej)
Related: [-]
18 18 adr ADR Report - Other Thu 12/11 11:46 AM
***DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING SIGNATURE ON PLEADING AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE***ADR Report Filed - by Kadee Helmick(Grubbs, Kenneth) Modified on 12/11/2014 to designate deficiency(aej).
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 06, 2014
17 17 ORDER Resetting Motion Hearing re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER, Set Motion Hearing for6 MOTION to Dismiss ( Motion Hearing reset for 12/17/2014 10:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra). Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
Related: [-]
Text Order GRANTING15 Motion to Continue Motion Hearing. Hearing will be reset by separate order. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tr1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 05, 2014
15 15 Unopposed MOTION to Continue December 9, 2014 Motion Hearing by Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC.(Bobo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 29, 2014
14 14 ORDER Resetting Hearing on6 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2014 9:45 AM before Judge David A. Ezra. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 22, 2014
13 13 ORDER Setting Hearing on6 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing reset for 12/9/2014 9:45 AM before Judge David A. Ezra. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 21, 2014
12 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 12/11/2014, Amended Pleadings due by 1/12/2015, Discovery due by 4/17/2015, Joinder of Parties due by 1/12/2015, Motions due by 5/22/2015. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 17, 2014
11 11 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC. (Bobo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 24, 2014
10 10 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Kadee Helmick, re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC(Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit a-j
Wednesday, September 17, 2014
9 9 Order for Scheduling Recommendations. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
Related: [-]
Text Order GRANTING8 Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing entered by Judge David A. Ezra. The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is RESET for Tuesday, December 9, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdb)
Related: [-]
Motion Hearing:6 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing reset for 12/9/2014 10:30 AM before Judge David A. Ezra, (aej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 16, 2014
8 8 Unopposed MOTION to Continue December 5, 2014 Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC.(Bobo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Unopposed Motion for Continuance
Friday, September 12, 2014
7 7 ORDER Setting Hearing on6 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2014 9:45 AM before Judge David A. Ezra. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (aej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 11, 2014
6 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC.(Bobo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Linda Riley,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 26, 2014
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kadee Helmick. Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC served on 8/21/2014, answer due 9/11/2014. (rf)
Related: [-]
4 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Kadee Helmick 1 Complaint - Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC Served 8/21/14, answer due 9/11/14 (Grubbs, Kenneth) Modified on 8/26/2014, to edit text (rf).
Related: [-]
Notice of Correction: ***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN EDITED TO REFLECT THAT IT IS A SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. ANSWER DUE DATE SET FOR 9/11/14**** re4 Summons Returned Executed (rf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 18, 2014
3 3 Summons Issued as to Hill Country Healthcare Systems, LLC. (aej)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 15, 2014
2 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KADEE HELMICK. (Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-6744715), filed by KADEE HELMICK.(Grubbs, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Case Assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej)
Related: [-]
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej)
Related: [-]