California Northern District Court
Judge:William Alsup
Case #: 3:21-cv-09818
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jun 18, 2022 1:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Twitter, Inc.
Represented By
Angela Lucille Dunning
Cooley LLP
contact info
Alexander J. Kasner
Cooley Llp - Library
contact info
Maurice Werter Trevor
Cooley LLP
contact info
Kyle Christopher Wong
Cooley LLP
contact info
Michael Graham Rhodes
Cooley LLP
contact info
Kathleen R. Hartnett
Cooley LLP
contact info
Aarti G. Reddy
Cooley LLP
contact info
Mediator
Harold Peter Smith
ADR Services, Inc. One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 480 (Ordway Bldg.)
Oakland, CA 94612
Plaintiff
Alex Berenson
Represented By
Sean Paul Gates
Charis Lex P.C.
contact info
Anthony Joseph Biller
Envisage Law
contact info
James Ruffin Lawrence, III
Envisage Law
contact info

GPO Apr 29 2022
ORDER RE 27 MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, July 11, 2022
52 52 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/11 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Joint) With Prejudice by Alex Berenson (Lawrence, James)
Related: [-]