Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-04591
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2021
Terminated:May 06, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 18, 2022 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ROBERT BARTH
Represented By
GERALD B SINGLETON
Singleton Schreiber Mckenzie & Scott - San Diego Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, May 06, 2022
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/13 12:58 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/20 2:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 12/20 2:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 12/20 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6594590.), filed by ROBERT BARTH. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]