Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03140
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2021
Terminated:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Floyd Calhoun Dent, Jr.
151 W. Circle Drive
Lexington, SC 29072
Represented By
Floyd Calhoun Dent, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Joanne Dent
151 W. Circle Drive
Lexington, SC 29072
Represented By
Joanne Dent
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Bradley
437 Dent Drive
Lexington, SC 29072
Represented By
Joseph Bradley
contact info
Defendant
Sherry Bradley
437 Dent Drive
Lexington, SC 29072
Represented By
Sherry Bradley
contact info
Defendant
Lakelin Pines, LLC
530 Lady Street Suite 202
Columbia, SC 29201
Represented By
Lakelin Pines, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
34 34 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 08/06 12:56 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 08/01 10:55 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, August 26, 2022
32 32 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/26 8:17 AM
Pretrial Scheduling Order. Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, July 14, 2022
31 31 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Thu 07/14 4:27 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held; Order to be submitted. Appearance(s): David Swan for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee; Joseph Bradley Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, June 30, 2022
30 30 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 06/30 2:47 PM
Notice of Hearing -Notice of Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,29 Statement filed by Christian K. Vogel
Monday, June 27, 2022
29 29 misc Statement Mon 06/27 4:14 PM
Statement (Mediator's Report) filed by Christian K. Vogel of Vogel & Cromwell, LLC on behalf of Christian K. Vogel. (Vogel, Christian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
28 28 court Hearing held Thu 04/14 3:06 PM
Hearing held; Appearance(s): David Swan for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
27 27 court Hearing held; pleading withdrawn in open court Thu 04/14 1:56 PM
Hearing held; Motion withdrawn in open court; Appearance(s): David Swan for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee; Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
26 26 court Entered in Error to Wrong Case Number: See entry Thu 04/14 12:08 PM
Entered in Error: See entry Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Response to Motion/Application filed by Joanne Dent, F.C. Dent
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
25 25 order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing Tue 04/12 3:50 PM
Order Continuing Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
24 24 4 pgs order Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Tue 04/12 3:41 PM
Order Granting Motion for More Definite Statement Against Defendants Floyd Calhoun Dent, Jr., Joanne Dent, Joseph Bradley and Sherry Bradley Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, April 04, 2022
23 23 answer Response Fri 04/08 9:50 AM
Response to Related [+] filed by Christina Dent. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
22 22 answer Response Fri 04/08 9:36 AM
Response to Related [+] filed by F.C. Dent Jr., Joanne Dent. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
21 21 answer Response Fri 04/08 9:04 AM
Response to Related [+] filed by Joseph Bradley, Sherry Bradley. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
20 20 answer Response Wed 04/06 2:15 PM
Amended Response to Related [+] filed by F.C. Dent Jr., Joanne Dent. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,14 Response to Motion/Application filed by Joanne Dent, F.C. Dent
Thursday, March 24, 2022
19 19 court Entry Modification Made: See entry Thu 03/24 2:00 PM
Entry Modification Made to edit text: See entry Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s) 18 Hearing continued
18 18 court Hearing continued Thu 03/24 1:47 PM
Hearing Held; Motion GRANTED. Appearance(s): David Swan; Floyd Dent, Jr.; Sherry Bradley; Joseph Bradley Related [+] If appropriate, additional relief to be considered on 4/14/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa) Modified on 3/24/2022 to edit text (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
16 16 court Hearing continued Thu 03/24 12:53 PM
Hearing held and continued; Appearance(s): David Swan; Christina Dent Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/14/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
17 17 answer Response Thu 03/24 1:45 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by Joseph Bradley, Sherry Bradley. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, March 21, 2022
15 15 answer Response Wed 03/23 11:07 AM
Response to and Request for 60 Day Extension. Related [+] filed by Christina Dent. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
14 14 answer Response Wed 03/23 8:08 AM
Response to Related [+] filed by F.C. Dent Jr., Joanne Dent. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, March 10, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 03/10 3:06 PM
Notice of Hearing and Motion Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
12 12 motion More Definite Statement Thu 03/10 3:04 PM
Motion for More Definite Statement Against Defendants Floyd Calhoun Dent, Jr., Joanne Dent, Joseph Bradley and Sherry Bradley filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 03/10 3:00 PM
Notice of Hearing and Motion Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
10 10 motion Default Judgment Thu 03/10 2:58 PM
Motion for Default Judgment and Entry of Default filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
9 9 answer None Thu 02/03 2:20 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Joseph Bradley, Sherry Bradley. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
8 8 court Entry Modification Made: See entry Wed 01/26 4:29 PM
Entry Modification Made to filing date: See entry Related [+] (Jones, D.)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Answer to Complaint filed by Joanne Dent, F.C. Dent
Monday, January 24, 2022
7 7 answer None Wed 01/26 4:11 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by F.C. Dent Jr., Joanne Dent. (Stehle, Michelle) Modified filing date on 1/26/2022 (Jones, D.)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/28 9:44 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/28 9:44 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/28 9:43 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, December 27, 2021
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Mon 12/27 1:23 PM
Summons and notice issued to Joseph Bradley ; Sherry Bradley ; Floyd Calhoun Dent Jr. ; Joanne Dent ; Lakelin Pines, LLC Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 12/22 12:20 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03140 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 34070167, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 12/22 12:19 PM
Adversary case 21-03140 Complaint against Floyd Calhoun Dent Jr., Joanne Dent, Joseph Bradley, Sherry Bradley, Lakelin Pines, LLC filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]