Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03141
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2021
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Floyd Calhoun Dent, Jr.
151 W. Circle Drive
Lexington, SC 29072
Represented By
Floyd Calhoun Dent, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Joanne Dent
151 W. Circle Drive
Lexington, SC 29072
Represented By
Joanne Dent
contact info
Defendant
The Dent Children Trust
Represented By
The Dent Children Trust
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Robert S. Westermann
Hirschler Fleischer, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
18 18 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 09/17 11:57 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 09/13 1:57 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, August 26, 2022
16 16 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/26 8:19 AM
Pretrial Scheduling Order. Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, July 14, 2022
15 15 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Thu 07/14 4:28 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held; Order to be submitted. Appearance(s): David Swan for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, June 30, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 06/30 2:49 PM
Notice of Hearing -Notice of Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference Related [+] filed by Robert S. Westermann of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,13 Statement filed by Christian K. Vogel
Monday, June 27, 2022
13 13 misc Statement Mon 06/27 4:16 PM
Statement (Mediator's Report) filed by Christian K. Vogel of Vogel & Cromwell, LLC on behalf of Christian K. Vogel. (Vogel, Christian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
12 12 court Hearing held Thu 04/14 3:07 PM
Hearing held; Appearance(s): David Swan for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, April 12, 2022
10 10 4 pgs order Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Tue 04/12 3:45 PM
Order Granting Motion for More Definite Statement Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, April 04, 2022
11 11 answer Response Thu 04/14 12:02 PM
Response to Related [+] filed by F.C. Dent Jr., Joanne Dent. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,8 Response to Motion/Application filed by Joanne Dent, F.C. Dent
Thursday, March 24, 2022
9 9 court Hearing continued Thu 03/24 2:08 PM
Hearing Held: Motion GRANTED. Appearance(s): David Swan; Floyd Dent, Jr. Related [+] If appropriate, additional relief to be considered on 4/14/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, March 21, 2022
8 8 answer Response Wed 03/23 8:04 AM
Response to Related [+] filed by F.C. Dent Jr., Joanne Dent. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, March 10, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Thu 03/10 3:29 PM
Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
6 6 motion More Definite Statement Thu 03/10 3:26 PM
Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
5 5 answer None Wed 01/26 4:14 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by F.C. Dent Jr., Joanne Dent. (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/29 9:39 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Wed 12/29 8:04 AM
Summons and notice issued to Floyd Calhoun Dent Jr. ; Joanne Dent ; The Dent Children Trust Related [+] (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 12/22 2:06 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 21-03141 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 34070516, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 12/22 12:24 PM
Adversary case 21-03141 Complaint against Floyd Calhoun Dent Jr., Joanne Dent, The Dent Children Trust filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Westermann, Robert)
Related: [-]