Connecticut District Court
Judge:Michael P Shea
Referred: Thomas O Farrish
Case #: 3:21-cv-01700
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Dec 22, 2021
Terminated:Oct 20, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 20, 2022 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
Kevin Fitzpatrick
Represented By
Christine Clarke
Reavis Page Jump LLP
contact info
Leslie A. Cahill
Spears Manning & Martini LLC
contact info
Mark Moore
Reavis Page Jump LLP
contact info
Joseph W. Martini
Spears Manning & Martini LLC
contact info
Defendant
Red Marble Media, Inc.
Represented By
Christine Clarke
Reavis Page Jump LLP
contact info
Leslie A. Cahill
Spears Manning & Martini LLC
contact info
Mark Moore
Reavis Page Jump LLP
contact info
Joseph W. Martini
Spears Manning & Martini LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Dost
Represented By
Todd Raymond Michaelis
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, Llp - Nh
contact info
James K. Robertson, Jr.
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 10, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/10 9:47 AM
ORDER. The consented-to66 motion to extend the deadline to reopen the case is hereby GRANTED. Any motion to reopen shall be filed no later than December 21, 2022 . Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/10/2022. (Davis, Christina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
66 66 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/09 2:32 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/21/2022 to Extend Deadline to Reopen Case by Stephen Dost. (Michaelis, Todd)
Related: [-]